Duban et al v. Waverly Sales Co et al

Defendant: Dale Chupp and Waverly Sales Co
Plaintiff: Martha Duban and Thomas Duban
Case Number: 6:2011cv02022
Filed: May 24, 2011
Court: Iowa Northern District Court
Office: Eastern Waterloo Office
County: Bremer
Presiding Judge: Linda R Reade
Referring Judge: Jon S Scoles
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 22, 2011 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 6 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Linda R Reade on 7/22/2011. (pac)
April 12, 2012 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 23 Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant Waverly Sales Co. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 04/12/2012. (skm)
February 25, 2013 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 57 Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 2/25/2013. (Stigler, Karo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duban et al v. Waverly Sales Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Chupp
Represented By: Philip A Burian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waverly Sales Co
Represented By: Karla Joy Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Duban
Represented By: Timm W Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Duban
Represented By: Timm W Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.