Serverside Group Limited et al v. Tactical 8 Technologies LLC et al

Defendant: Tactical 8 Technologies LLC and Bank Iowa Corporation
Plaintiff: Serverside Group Limited and Serverside Graphics Inc.
 
Case Number: 6:2012cv02016
Filed: February 29, 2012
 
Court: Iowa Northern District Court
Office: Eastern Waterloo Office
County: Black Hawk
Presiding Judge: Linda R Reade
Referring Judge: Jon S Scoles
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 4, 2013 130 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Regarding Construction of Disputed Patent Claim Terms: See text of Order for further information . Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 03/04/13. (kfs)
December 9, 2013 144 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER: Granting in Part and Denying in Part 133 Motion for Summary Judgment: Denying 137 Motion to Strike Affidavit of Plaintiffs' Expert: See text of Order for further information. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 12/09/13. (kfs)
January 6, 2014 168 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 151 Motion For Partial Reconsideration of 144 Summary Judgment Order (See Order Text). Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 1/6/2014. (des)
January 10, 2014 169 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 143 Motion in Limine. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge Mark W Bennett on 1/10/14. (djs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Serverside Group Limited et al v. Tactical 8 Technologies LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tactical 8 Technologies LLC
Represented By: Michael A Dee
Represented By: Brant D Kahler
Represented By: G Brian Pingel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank Iowa Corporation
Represented By: Michael A Dee
Represented By: Brant D Kahler
Represented By: G Brian Pingel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Serverside Group Limited
Represented By: Charles T Steenburg
Represented By: Hunter D Keeton
Represented By: Glenn L Johnson
Represented By: Michael A Albert
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Serverside Graphics Inc.
Represented By: Michael A Albert
Represented By: Glenn L Johnson
Represented By: Hunter D Keeton
Represented By: Charles T Steenburg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]