Precision of New Hampton, Inc v. TriComponent Products Corporation

Defendant: TriComponent Products Corporation
Plaintiff: Precision of New Hampton, Inc
Case Number: 6:2012cv02020
Filed: March 13, 2012
Court: Iowa Northern District Court
Office: Eastern Waterloo Office
County: Chickasaw
Presiding Judge: Edward J McManus
Referring Judge: Jon S Scoles
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 14, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 27 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 11/14/2012. (skm)
December 13, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 31 Amended and Substituted Motion to Compel Discovery. However, Defendant may serve a substituted set of interrogatories which complies with Fed. R. Civ. P. 33(a)(1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 12/13/12. (ksy)
June 5, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 43 Motion to Compel Discovery (see text of Order for details). Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 06/05/2013. (skm)
June 25, 2013 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 49 Motion to Set Aside Order 48 Order on Motion to Compel . Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 6/25/2013. (JK)
July 17, 2013 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 59 Motion to Compel; denying 64 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 7/17/2013. (Stigler, Karo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Precision of New Hampton, Inc v. TriComponent Products Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TriComponent Products Corporation
Represented By: Samuel C Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Precision of New Hampton, Inc
Represented By: James R Hellman
Represented By: David J Dutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.