Sellers v. John Deere Agri Services Inc et al

Plaintiff: Michael Joseph Sellers
Defendant: John Deere Agri Services Inc, Deere & Company and Clyde D'Cruz
 
Case Number: 6:2012cv02050
Filed: July 13, 2012
 
Court: Iowa Northern District Court
Office: Eastern Waterloo Office
County: Black Hawk
Presiding Judge: Edward J McManus
Referring Judge: Jon S Scoles
 
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 19, 2014 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 84 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. The Second Amended Complaint 45 is dismissed. The case is closed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 5/19/14. (ksy)
February 14, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 20 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (see text of order for specifics). Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 2/14/2013. (pac)
March 19, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 40 Motion to Amend/Correct 2 Complaint filed by Michael Joseph Sellers. Not later than 3/26/2013, Sellers may file a second amended complaint which is fully compliant with the Court's prior 35 Ruling on Motion to Dismiss and this Ruling. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 3/19/2013. (skm)
January 7, 2014 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 63 Motion for Protective Order. Deere's chairman and CEO, Samuel R. Allen, is not required to submit to a deposition at this time. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 1/7/2014. (skm)
February 5, 2014 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 82 Motion to Set Aside/Reconsider Order re 77 Order (see text of Order). Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 2/5/2014. (skm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Sellers v. John Deere Agri Services Inc et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Joseph Sellers
Represented By: Gregory T Racette
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Deere Agri Services Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deere & Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clyde D'Cruz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]