Lenius et al v. John Deere Agri Services, Inc et al SEE ENTRY [11] FOR DISMISSAL OF DEF DEERE

Plaintiff: Wanda Jo Lenius and Gary Gene Lenius
Defendant: Clyde D'Cruz, Kevin Keith, Brian Matson and Robert Barnes
Case Number: 6:2012cv02063
Filed: August 31, 2012
Court: Iowa Northern District Court
Office: Eastern Waterloo Office
County: Black Hawk
Presiding Judge: Edward J McManus
Referring Judge: Jon S Scoles
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 25, 2014 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 81 Motion for Summary Judgment. See text of order. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 6/25/2014. (pac)
November 12, 2014 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 108 Motion to Strike Untimely Expert Reports from Michael Sandberg and to Preclude Sandberg from Testifying at Trial Regarding Untimely Disclosed Opinions (see text of Order). Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 11/12/2014. (skm)
December 4, 2014 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying (116) Motion for Authorization to Perpetuate by Videography Trial Testimony of Unavailable Witnesses in case 6:12-cv-02063-JSS; denying (106) Motion for Authorization to Perpetuate by Videography Trial Testimony of Unavailable Witnesses in case 6:12-cv-02072-JSS. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 12/4/2014. (pac)
February 14, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (see text of order for specifics). Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 2/14/2013. (pac)
March 20, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 31 MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Wanda Jo Lenius, Gary Gene Lenius. Not later than 3/26/2013, Plaintiffs may file a second amended complaint which is fully compliant with the Court's prior ruling on motion to dismiss (docket number 28 ) and this ruling. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 3/20/2013. (pac)
January 7, 2014 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 61 Motion for Protective Order. Deere's chairman and CEO, Samuel R. Allen, is not required to submit to a deposition at this time. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 1/7/2014. (skm)
February 5, 2014 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 80 Motion to Set Aside/Reconsider Order re 75 Order (see text of Order). Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 2/5/2014. (skm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lenius et al v. John Deere Agri Services, Inc et al SEE ENTRY [11] FOR DISMISSAL OF DEF DEERE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Jo Lenius
Represented By: Gregory T Racette
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Gene Lenius
Represented By: Gregory T Racette
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clyde D'Cruz
Represented By: Debra Lynne Hulett
Represented By: Frank Harty
Represented By: Frances M Haas
Represented By: Angel Anna West
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Keith
Represented By: Frances M Haas
Represented By: Frank Harty
Represented By: Debra Lynne Hulett
Represented By: Angel Anna West
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Matson
Represented By: Frances M Haas
Represented By: Frank Harty
Represented By: Debra Lynne Hulett
Represented By: Angel Anna West
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Barnes
Represented By: Frances M Haas
Represented By: Frank Harty
Represented By: Debra Lynne Hulett
Represented By: Angel Anna West
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]