Hudson v. Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc

Plaintiff: Delbert E Hudson
Defendant: Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc
Case Number: 6:2012cv02079
Filed: November 6, 2012
Court: Iowa Northern District Court
Office: Eastern Waterloo Office
County: Black Hawk
Presiding Judge: Linda R Reade
Referring Judge: Jon S Scoles
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 26, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 12 Motion for Summary Judgment. (See text of order) Signed by Chief Judge Linda R Reade on 2/26/2014. (pac)
April 1, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 21 Motion to Amend/Correct or Alter Judgment and/or to Obtain Relief from the Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Linda R Reade on 4/1/2014. (skm)
May 1, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 32 Motion for Court to Review Taxation of Costs. 31 Clerk of Court's award of costs is set aside. Signed by Chief Judge Linda R Reade on 5/1/2014. (pac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hudson v. Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delbert E Hudson
Represented By: Jeffrey R Tronvold
Represented By: Matthew James Reilly
Represented By: Laura C Mueller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc
Represented By: Michael R Reck
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]