Kuennen et al v. Wright Medical Technology, Inc - Dft Wright Medical Group, Inc termed per #7

Plaintiff: Martin P. Kuennen and Carol Kuennen
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology, Inc
Case Number: 6:2014cv02045
Filed: July 10, 2014
Court: Iowa Northern District Court
Office: Eastern Waterloo Office
County: Fayette
Presiding Judge: Linda R Reade
Referring Judge: Jon S Scoles
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 20, 2015 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 27 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Tiffany L. Carpenter on behalf of Defendants Wright Medical Group, Inc., and Wright Medical Technology, Inc. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 1/20/2015 (conflicts checked, none found). (skm)
February 25, 2015 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 23 Motion for Protective Order; granting in part and denying in part 26 Motion for Protective Order. (See text of Ruling.) Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 2/25/2015. (Stigler, Karo)
March 20, 2015 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 41 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney George E. McLaughlin on behalf of the Plaintiffs Martin P. Kuennen and Carol Kuennen. ECF Registration due by 4/3/2015. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 3/20/2015 (conflicts checked, none found) (copy w/NEF and ECF Registration form emailed to attorney McLaughlin). (skm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Iowa Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kuennen et al v. Wright Medical Technology, Inc - Dft Wright Medical Group, Inc termed per #7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin P. Kuennen
Represented By: Larry D Helvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Kuennen
Represented By: Larry D Helvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology, Inc
Represented By: Megan Rett Dimitt
Represented By: Michael O Fawaz
Represented By: Gregory M Lederer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.