DE GAETANO v. LAPINSKI et al

Plaintiff: RICHARD DE GAETANO
Defendant: JOHN J LAPINSKI and LINDA S LAPINSKI
Trustee: BANGOR SAVINGS BANK, MACHIAS SAVINGS BANK, CAMDEN NATIONAL BANK and DIGGA DOWN EAST LLC
 
Case Number: 1:2008cv00294
Filed: September 8, 2008
 
Court: Maine District Court
Office: Negotiable Instrument Office
Referring Judge: MARGARET J. KRAVCHUK
Presiding Judge: JOHN A. WOODCOCK
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 10, 2012 103 Featured Case ORDER adopting 102 Report and Recommended Decision for 95 Motion for Attorney Fees filed by RICHARD DE GAETANO, denying 95 Motion for Attorney Fees. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
April 16, 2009 37 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re 33 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by RICHARD DE GAETANO. Objections to R&R due by 5/4/2009. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARGARET J. KRAVCHUK. (CWP)
May 6, 2009 38 Featured Case ORDER granting 33 Motion for Summary Judgment; adopting 37 Report and Recommended Decision for 33 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by RICHARD DE GAETANO. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
May 18, 2011 81 Featured Case FINDINGS OF FACT AND ORDER REGARDING TURNOVER OF TRUSTEE ASSETS granting 80 Motion for turnover order. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARGARET J. KRAVCHUK. (CWP)
June 28, 2011 92 Featured Case ORDER affirming 91 Report and Recommended Decision for 84 Emergency Motion for Contempt and Other Relief filed by RICHARD DE GAETANO; granting 84 Emergency Motion for Contempt and Other Relief. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: DE GAETANO v. LAPINSKI et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD DE GAETANO
Represented By: DANIEL A. NUZZI
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN J LAPINSKI
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINDA S LAPINSKI
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: BANGOR SAVINGS BANK
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: MACHIAS SAVINGS BANK
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: CAMDEN NATIONAL BANK
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: DIGGA DOWN EAST LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]