USA v. WILLIAMS et al

Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: VICKI J WILLIAMS
 
Case Number: 1:2008cv00427
Filed: December 12, 2008
 
Court: Maine District Court
Office: Real Property: Foreclosure Office
Referring Judge: MARGARET J. KRAVCHUK
Presiding Judge: JOHN A. WOODCOCK
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Plaintiff
Jury Demanded By: 28:1345 Foreclosure

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 10, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 5 Motion to Dismiss; adopting 8 Report and Recommended Decision for 5 Motion to Dismiss filed by VICKI J WILLIAMS. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
August 12, 2009 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER affirming Report and Recommended Decision re 42 Report and Recommendations; affirming Report and Recommended Decision re 43 Report and Recommendations; granting 29 Motion for Default Judgment; granting 30 Motion for Summary Judgment. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (jgw)
August 12, 2009 45 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT of Foreclosure and Sale By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (jgw)
February 18, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re 5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by VICKI J WILLIAMS. Objections to R&R due by 3/9/2009. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARGARET J. KRAVCHUK. (CWP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: USA v. WILLIAMS et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: DAVID R. COLLINS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VICKI J WILLIAMS
Represented By: SETH D. HARROW
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]