SHAW v. 500516 NB LTD et al

Defendant: ADAM TOMPKINS and 500516 NB LTD
Plaintiff: MAX SHAW
 
Case Number: 1:2009cv00264
Filed: June 19, 2009
 
Court: Maine District Court
Office: Motor Vehicle Office
Referring Judge: MARGARET J. KRAVCHUK
Presiding Judge: JOHN A. WOODCOCK
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 21, 2009 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 7 MOTION for Default Judgment By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (jgw)
August 27, 2009 29 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re 7 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants filed by MAX SHAW, 11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by 500516 NB LTD, ADAM TOMPKINS. Objections to R&R due by 9/14/2009. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARGARET J. KRAVCHUK. (CWP)
October 23, 2009 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER affirming 29 Report and Recommendations; vacating 9 Order on motion for Entry of Default, granting in part and denying in part 33 Motion to Strike ; granting in part and denying in part 34 Motion for Leave to File; denying 7 Motion for Default Judgment; denying 11 Motion to Dismiss By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (jgw)
July 22, 2010 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing without prejudice 47 Motion in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony; denying 48 Motion for Summary Judgment. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: SHAW v. 500516 NB LTD et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADAM TOMPKINS
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER P. FLANAGAN
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 500516 NB LTD
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER P. FLANAGAN
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAX SHAW
Represented By: PETER CLIFFORD
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]