HANDLER et al v. MAYHEW et al

Defendant: UNKNOWN PERSON or PERSONS, BRYANT WHITE, MARY MAYHEW, DEBRA POTTER and CLAUDIA KJER
Plaintiff: RUSSELL HANDLER and ELEANOR HANDLER
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00308
Filed: August 12, 2011
 
Court: Maine District Court
Office: Bangor Office
County: Waldo
Referring Judge: JOHN H. RICH
Presiding Judge: GEORGE Z. SINGAL
 
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 12, 2013 143 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 131 Motion under Rule 35. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (jlg)
December 30, 2013 171 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 153 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Count XIII. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
January 23, 2012 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTIONS TO SEAL, UNSEAL mooting 1 Motion to Seal the Complaint; granting 33 Motion to Seal; denying 34 Sealed Motion to Unseal Complaint ; granting in part and denying in part 39 Sealed Motion Motion to Seal Motion to Dismiss and Exhibits ; denying 45 Motion to Seal Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (dfr) Modified on 1/24/2012 to unseal (dfr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: HANDLER et al v. MAYHEW et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN PERSON or PERSONS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRYANT WHITE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARY MAYHEW
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEBRA POTTER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLAUDIA KJER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUSSELL HANDLER
Represented By: JOSEPH BALDACCI
Represented By: ERIC M. MEHNERT
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELEANOR HANDLER
Represented By: ERIC M. MEHNERT
Represented By: JOSEPH BALDACCI
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]