MILLAY v. STATE OF MAINE DEPARTMENT OF LABOR

Defendant: STATE OF MAINE DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
Plaintiff: JOHN M MILLAY
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00438
Filed: November 15, 2011
 
Court: Maine District Court
Office: Bangor Office
County: Kennebec
Referring Judge: MARGARET J. KRAVCHUK
Presiding Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
 
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 26, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AFFIRMING THE RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE granting 7 Motion to Dismiss; adopting Report and Recommended Decision re 12 Report and Recommendations. By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (dfr)
December 5, 2012 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AFFIRMING THE RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE-re 31 Report and Recommendations granting 26 Motion to Amend. REMINDER: After entry of this Order, if Amending a COMPLAINT, counsel are REQUIRED to separately file the AMENDED COMPLAINT Document By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (dfr)
January 8, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY denying 37 Motion for Certificate of Appealability; denying 37 Motion to Stay By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (dfr)
April 2, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 46 Motion to supplement; Plaintiff's brief in support of vacating the administrative order due 5/2/13. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARGARET J. KRAVCHUK. (CWP)
December 9, 2013 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS APPEAL OF ADMINISTRATIVE DECISION By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (dfr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: MILLAY v. STATE OF MAINE DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF MAINE DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN M MILLAY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]