ERGO LICENSING LLC v. CARDINAL HEALTH INC et al

Plaintiff: ERGO LICENSING LLC
Defendant: CAREFUSION 303 INC
Counter_claimant: CAREFUSION 303 INC
Counter_defendant: ERGO LICENSING LLC
 
Case Number: 2:2008cv00259
Filed: August 1, 2008
 
Court: Maine District Court
Office: Patent Office
Referring Judge: JOHN H. RICH
Presiding Judge: GEORGE Z. SINGAL
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 35:271 Patent Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 25, 2010 172 Featured Case ORDER AFFIRMING THE RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE denying 117 Motion to Dismiss; adopting Report and Recommended Decision re 167 Report and Recommendations. By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (nrg)
July 13, 2010 177 Featured Case ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE- Scheduling Conference set for 8/3/2010 at 10:00 AM in Judge Singal's Chambers before JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. Counsel shall file a Joint Agenda for the Conference by NOON on 7/30/2010. By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
December 28, 2010 204 Featured Case ORDER ON CLAIMS CONSTRUCTION re 139 Motion on Claims Construction. By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
March 5, 2009 47 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY -granting 42 Motion for Jurisdictional Discovery ; granting 42 Motion to Stay deadline for responding to Motion to Dismiss. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (mnw)
August 19, 2009 74 Featured Case ORDER AFFIRMING THE RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 65 Report and Recommendations; Granting 30 Motion to Dismiss; Denying 36 Motion to Change Venue. By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: ERGO LICENSING LLC v. CARDINAL HEALTH INC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERGO LICENSING LLC
Represented By: SETH W. BREWSTER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAREFUSION 303 INC
Represented By: MARC BELLOLI
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: CAREFUSION 303 INC
Represented By: MARC BELLOLI
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: ERGO LICENSING LLC
Represented By: JAMES G. GOGGIN
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]