US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR BAFC2006-1 v. JAMES

Counter_defendant: US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR BAFC2006-1
Counter_claimant: GORDON T JAMES
Thirdparty_defendant: GMAC MORTGAGE LLC and QUICKEN LOANS INC
Thirdparty_plaintiff: GORDON T JAMES
Defendant: GORDON T JAMES
Plaintiff: US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR BAFC2006-1
Case Number: 2:2009cv00084
Filed: March 6, 2009
Court: Maine District Court
Office: Real Property: Foreclosure Office
Presiding Judge: JOHN H. RICH
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1601 Truth in Lending

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 22, 2010 189 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Mooting in Part 89 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 163 Motion to Dismiss. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (dfr)
October 4, 2010 191 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION ON MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY re 85 Motion in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony by Kevin P. Byers By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (nrg)
January 10, 2011 193 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER RE: 89 Motion for Summary Judgment; 95 Motion for Summary Judgment; 122 Motion to Amend. ; 150 Motion to Stay By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (dfr)
January 31, 2011 196 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION ON MOTION FOR RELIEF PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 56(G) By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (dfr)
August 9, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re 15 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims filed by GMAC MORTGAGE LLC, WELLS FARGO NA, US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR BAFC2006-1 Objections to R&R due by 8/24/2009 By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (lrc)
August 26, 2009 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AFFIRMING THE RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 27 Report and Recommendations; Granting 23 Motion to Strike; Granting in part 15 Motion to Dismiss. By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (kic) Modified on 8/27/2009 to clean up docket text (kic).
January 26, 2010 64 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND granting 38 Motion to Amend. REMINDER: After entry of this Order, if Amending a COMPLAINT, counsel are REQUIRED to separately file the AMENDED COMPLAINT Document. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (dfr)
February 21, 2010 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 61 Motion to Quash By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (dfr)
April 5, 2010 78 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION ON DEFENDANTS SECOND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND, MOTION TO COMPEL, AND MOTION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER denying 63 Motion for Leave to Amend; denying 69 Motion TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER ; denying 71 Motion to Compel. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (dfr) Modified on 4/6/2010 to correct filing date(dfr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR BAFC2006-1 v. JAMES
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR BAFC2006-1
Represented By: NATHANIEL R. HUCKEL-BAUER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: GORDON T JAMES
Represented By: ANDREA BOPP STARK
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: GMAC MORTGAGE LLC
Represented By: NATHANIEL R. HUCKEL-BAUER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: QUICKEN LOANS INC
Represented By: STEPHEN Y. HODSDON
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: GORDON T JAMES
Represented By: ANDREA BOPP STARK
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GORDON T JAMES
Represented By: ANDREA BOPP STARK
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR BAFC2006-1
Represented By: NATHANIEL R. HUCKEL-BAUER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]