SMALL v. WAL-MART STORES INC

Defendant: WALMART STORES EAST LP
Plaintiff: CHARLES SMALL, JR
 
Case Number: 2:2009cv00088
Filed: March 13, 2009
 
Court: Maine District Court
Office: P.I.: Other Office
Referring Judge: JOHN H. RICH
Presiding Judge: GEORGE Z. SINGAL
 
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 16, 2009 41 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by WALMART STORES EAST LP Objections to R&R due by 1/4/2010 By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (cef)
January 8, 2010 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AFFIRMING THE RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 41 Report and Recommendations, Granting 21 Motion for Summary Judgment By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
April 1, 2010 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE APPEAL denying 50 Motion to Extend Time By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: SMALL v. WAL-MART STORES INC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALMART STORES EAST LP
Represented By: DANIEL R. MAWHINNEY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES SMALL, JR
Represented By: ROBERT A. LASKOFF
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]