NATIONWIDE PAYMENT SOLUTIONS LLC v. PLUNKETT et al

Defendant: PLUNKETT AND COMPANY LLC and JAMES PLUNKETT
Counter_claimant: PLUNKETT AND COMPANY LLC and JAMES PLUNKETT
Counter_defendant: NATIONWIDE PAYMENT SOLUTIONS LLC
Plaintiff: NATIONWIDE PAYMENT SOLUTIONS LLC
Case Number: 2:2009cv00600
Filed: November 24, 2009
Court: Maine District Court
Office: Trademark Office
Referring Judge: JOHN H. RICH
Presiding Judge: GEORGE Z. SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1051 Trademark Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 16, 2011 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AFFIRMING THERECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE granting 62 Motion for Default Judgment; adopting 90 Report and Recommendations; denying 93 Motion to Extend Time. By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
March 16, 2011 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AFFIRMING THERECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE granting 71 Motion for Summary Judgment; adopting 91 Report and Recommendations. By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
October 28, 2011 121 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER ON MOTION FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW re 117 MOTION for In Camera Review of Bernstein Shur Invoices filed by NATIONWIDE PAYMENT SOLUTIONS LLC ( Unredacted copy of attorney invoices or notice that it chooses to stand on its redacted invoices due by 11/7/2011.) By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (mjlt)
February 15, 2012 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AFFIRMING THE RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE granting 111 Motion for Attorney Fees; adopting Report and Recommended Decision re 124 Report and Recommendations. By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
March 24, 2010 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION granting 8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (nrg)
September 16, 2010 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION TO DISMISS AND ISSUE SANCTIONS denying 59 Motion to Dismiss By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
September 30, 2010 67 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS FOR SANCTIONS denying 54 and 57 Motion for Sanctions By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (lrc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NATIONWIDE PAYMENT SOLUTIONS LLC v. PLUNKETT et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLUNKETT AND COMPANY LLC
Represented By: AJAY JAGTIANI
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES PLUNKETT
Represented By: AJAY JAGTIANI
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: PLUNKETT AND COMPANY LLC
Represented By: AJAY JAGTIANI
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: JAMES PLUNKETT
Represented By: AJAY JAGTIANI
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: NATIONWIDE PAYMENT SOLUTIONS LLC
Represented By: KATHRYN W. MCGINTEE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONWIDE PAYMENT SOLUTIONS LLC
Represented By: KATHRYN W. MCGINTEE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]