HENDERSON v. ATLANTIC PELAGIC SEAFOOD LLC et al

Plaintiff: MARK HENDERSON
Defendant: ATLANTIC PELAGIC SEAFOOD LLC and JAMES ODLIN
 
Case Number: 2:2010cv00068
Filed: February 17, 2010
 
Court: Maine District Court
Office: Portland Office
Presiding Judge: D. BROCK HORNBY
Referring Judge: JOHN H. RICH
 
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:688 Jones Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 18, 2010 40 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re 26 MOTION to Set Aside Default and MOTION for Leave to File Late Answer filed by ATLANTIC PELAGIC SEAFOOD LLC. Objections to R&R due by 12/6/2010. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (mnw)
December 9, 2010 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AFFIRMING RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE denying 26 Motion to Set Aside ; denying 26 Motion for Leave to File Late Answer; adopting Report and Recommended Decision re 40 Report and Recommendations. By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (mnw)
April 22, 2011 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AFFIRMING RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 62 Report and Recommendations re 14 Motion for Default Judgment. By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (mnw)
April 22, 2011 64 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED RECOMMENDED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW ON MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT re 14 MOTION for Default Judgment. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (mnw)
April 22, 2011 65 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER AFFIRMING RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 64 Amended Report and Recommendations re 14 Motion for Default Judgment. - By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (mnw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: HENDERSON v. ATLANTIC PELAGIC SEAFOOD LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK HENDERSON
Represented By: R. TERRANCE DUDDY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATLANTIC PELAGIC SEAFOOD LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES ODLIN
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]