COLES v. REID COLES

Defendant: SUDIE REID COLES
Plaintiff: JAMES R COLES
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv00219
Filed: May 27, 2011
 
Court: Maine District Court
Office: Portland Office
County: Sagadahoc
Referring Judge: MARGARET J. KRAVCHUK
Presiding Judge: GEORGE Z. SINGAL
 
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 15, 2011 29 Featured Case ORDER denying 22 Motion for Recusal. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARGARET J. KRAVCHUK. (CWP)
October 14, 2011 42 Featured Case ORDER ON MOTION TO ASSIGN A FAIR JUDGE re 40 Motion to Assign a Fair Judge By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (lrc)
December 13, 2011 62 Featured Case ORDER AFFIRMING THE RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 21 Motion to Remand to State Court; adopting Report and Recommended Decision re 56 Report and Recommendations. By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
December 4, 2012 84 Featured Case ORDER AFFIRMING THE RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE and granting 81 Motion for Attorney Fees in the reduced amount of $3,731.25; adopting Report and Recommended Decision re 83 Report and Recommendations. By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (MSH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: COLES v. REID COLES
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUDIE REID COLES
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES R COLES
Represented By: JONATHAN M. DAVIS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]