MALENKO v. HANDRAHAN

Defendant: LORI HANDRAHAN
Plaintiff: IGOR MALENKO
Case Number: 2:2011cv00250
Filed: June 27, 2011
Court: Maine District Court
Office: Portland Office
County: Cumberland
Referring Judge: JOHN H. RICH
Presiding Judge: GEORGE Z. SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 10, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court PROCEDURAL ORDER & REPORT OF CONFERENCE: Hearing set for 5/11/2012 at 1:00 p.m. The parties are required to provide the Court with copies of exhibits they intend to offer at the hearing by NOON on 5/10/2012. Defendant's Final Pretrial Memo shall be filed by NOON on 4/17/2012. This case is removed from the May trial list and will be placed on the 6/4/2012 trial list. By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
April 27, 2012 29 Opinion or Order of the Court PROCEDURAL ORDER - By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (mnw)
June 28, 2012 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ENTERING DEFAULT By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
August 22, 2012 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON PRO SE MOTION denying 60 (Document sealed from public view) SEALED MOTION to Vacate Order and/or Reconsider filed by LORI HANDRAHAN By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
October 24, 2012 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT granting 56 Motion for Default Judgment By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MALENKO v. HANDRAHAN
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LORI HANDRAHAN
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IGOR MALENKO
Represented By: MICHAEL J. WAXMAN
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]