ESTATE OF CRAIG L ALLARD, et al v. WILLIAMS et al

Defendant: AARON M PHINNEY, ROBERT A WILLIAMS, PHILLIP ALEXANDER and ROGER TEACHOUT
Plaintiff: CHARLENE ALLARD and ESTATE OF CRAIG L ALLARD
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv00283
Filed: July 25, 2011
 
Court: Maine District Court
Office: Portland Office
County: York
Presiding Judge: D. BROCK HORNBY
Referring Judge: JOHN H. RICH
 
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 10, 2011 14 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT OF HEARING AND ORDER re: Scheduling Order re: granting 11 Objection to Scheduling Order By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (mjlt)
June 28, 2012 44 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT OF PRE-FILING CONFERENCE UNDER LOCAL RULE 56 - Stipulation of Facts and any additional statements of fact as to which counsel have not been able to stipulate due by 7/20/2012. Motions for Summary Judgment and any response to the statement of fact filed on 7/20/2012 that were not stipulated due by 7/27/2012. Response to the Summary Judgment Motions due by 8/10/2012. Replies due by 8/15/2012. By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (mnw)
December 10, 2012 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AFFIRMING RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE - adopting Report and Recommended Decision re 57 Report and Recommendations. By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (mnw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: ESTATE OF CRAIG L ALLARD, et al v. WILLIAMS et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AARON M PHINNEY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT A WILLIAMS
Represented By: WILLIAM R. FISHER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILLIP ALEXANDER
Represented By: WILLIAM R. FISHER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROGER TEACHOUT
Represented By: WILLIAM R. FISHER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLENE ALLARD
Represented By: WILLIAM T. BLY
Represented By: CHRIS A. NIELSEN
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF CRAIG L ALLARD
Represented By: CHRIS A. NIELSEN
Represented By: WILLIAM T. BLY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]