PAN AM SYSTEMS INC et al v. HARDENBERG et al

Defendant: CM HARDENBERG PA, ATLANTIC NORTHEAST RAILS AND PORTS and CHALMERS HARDENBERG
Plaintiff: PAN AM SYSTEMS INC, SPRINGFIELD TERMINAL RAILWAY COMPANY and DAVID ANDREW FINK
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv00339
Filed: September 6, 2011
 
Court: Maine District Court
Office: Portland Office
County: York
Referring Judge: JOHN H. RICH
Presiding Judge: GEORGE Z. SINGAL
 
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 14, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS 14 By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (dfr)
October 12, 2012 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 33 Motion to Stay By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (dfr)
September 30, 2014 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT granting 65 Motion for Summary Judgment By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (dfr)
October 1, 2014 82 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 65 MOTION for Summary Judgment By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (dfr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: PAN AM SYSTEMS INC et al v. HARDENBERG et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CM HARDENBERG PA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATLANTIC NORTHEAST RAILS AND PORTS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHALMERS HARDENBERG
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAN AM SYSTEMS INC
Represented By: THAD B. ZMISTOWSKI
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SPRINGFIELD TERMINAL RAILWAY COMPANY
Represented By: THAD B. ZMISTOWSKI
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID ANDREW FINK
Represented By: THAD B. ZMISTOWSKI
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]