JONES v. FAIRBANK RECONSTRUCTION CORP et al

Cross_defendant: FAIRBANK RECONSTRUCTION CORP
Cross_claimant: GREATER OMAHA PACKING COMPANY INC
Plaintiff: EMMIE JONES
Defendant: FAIRBANK RECONSTRUCTION CORP and GREATER OMAHA PACKING COMPANY INC
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv00437
Filed: November 14, 2011
 
Court: Maine District Court
Office: Portland Office
County: Androscoggin
Referring Judge: JOHN H. RICH
Presiding Judge: GEORGE Z. SINGAL
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 13, 2013 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT granting in part and denying in part 58 Motion for Summary Judgment By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
November 13, 2013 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION FOR SANCTIONS denying without prejudice 93 Motion for Sanctions By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
April 30, 2014 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE & MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT granting 161 Motion to Seal; Granting in Part and Denying in Part and reserving ruling in Part 161 Sealed Motion for Approval of Settlement By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
May 8, 2014 204 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON FAIRBANKS MOTIONS IN LIMINE re 136 140 142 143 144 145 146 147 148 157 By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
May 8, 2014 206 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON GOPACS MOTIONS IN LIMINE re 129 130 131 132 133 134 135 137 138 139 141 149 150 155 202 By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
April 5, 2012 35 Opinion or Order of the Court PROCEDURAL ORDER & ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 4/27/2012. By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
May 14, 2012 42 Opinion or Order of the Court PROCEDURAL ORDER & ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Status Report due by 6/19/2012. By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
August 31, 2012 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION TO PRESERVE AND HOLD EVIDENCE denying docket no. 48 By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (cef)
September 11, 2012 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS CROSSCLAIMS granting docket no 23 By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (cef)
September 11, 2012 56 Opinion or Order of the Court PROCEDURAL ORDER FOLLOWING CONFERENCE OF COUNSEL granting in part and denying in part docket nos. 25 and 26 By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (cef)
May 31, 2013 92 Opinion or Order of the Court PROCEDURAL ORDER granting without objection 89 Motion for Leave to File s Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Fairbank's Motion for Summary Judgment By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: JONES v. FAIRBANK RECONSTRUCTION CORP et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: FAIRBANK RECONSTRUCTION CORP
Represented By: PAUL C. CATSOS
Represented By: SHAWN K. STEVENS
Represented By: RALPH A. WEBER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: GREATER OMAHA PACKING COMPANY INC
Represented By: ALISON DENHAM
Represented By: STEPHEN P ELLENBECKER
Represented By: DAVID PATTERSON GLOOR
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMMIE JONES
Represented By: MICHAEL J. WAXMAN
Represented By: FRED H. PRITZKER
Represented By: RYAN M. OSTERHOLM
Represented By: ERIC W. HAGEMAN
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FAIRBANK RECONSTRUCTION CORP
Represented By: PAUL C. CATSOS
Represented By: SHAWN K. STEVENS
Represented By: RALPH A. WEBER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREATER OMAHA PACKING COMPANY INC
Represented By: ALISON DENHAM
Represented By: STEPHEN P ELLENBECKER
Represented By: DAVID PATTERSON GLOOR
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]