SEBUNYA v. HOLDER

Plaintiff: MOSES ALI SEBUNYA
Defendant: ERIC H HOLDER, JR
Case Number: 2:2012cv00067
Filed: February 21, 2012
Court: Maine District Court
Office: Portland Office
County: Cumberland
Referring Judge: JOHN H. RICH
Presiding Judge: GEORGE Z. SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 30, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER ON MOTION TO STRIKE denying 13 Motion to Strike By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (lrc)
May 15, 2013 58 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER ON MOTION TO AMEND ANSWER denying 38 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Answer By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (lrc)
July 30, 2013 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON APPEAL OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION granting in part 62 Appeal from Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
September 26, 2013 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION TO REOPEN DISCOVERY granting in part and denying in part 69 Motion to Reopen Discovery By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
January 31, 2014 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & REPORT OF CONFERENCE By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SEBUNYA v. HOLDER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOSES ALI SEBUNYA
Represented By: DAVID G. WEBBERT
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC H HOLDER, JR
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]