AWUGAH v. KEY BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Plaintiff: SUSAN AWUGAH
Defendant: KEY BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv00097
Filed: March 20, 2012
 
Court: Maine District Court
Office: Portland Office
County: Cumberland
Presiding Judge: D. BROCK HORNBY
Referring Judge: MARGARET J. KRAVCHUK
 
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 18, 2012 12 Featured Case ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S APPEAL OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER re 10 Appeal from Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court. By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (mnw)
November 14, 2012 21 Featured Case REPORT OF PRE-FILING CONFERENCE UNDER RULE 56 - By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (mnw)
January 11, 2013 35 Featured Case PROCEDURAL ORDER - Set Deadlines: Plaintiff's filing by 1/25/2013. Defendant's reply due by 2/1/2013. By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (mnw)
March 12, 2013 42 Featured Case DECISION AND ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - denying 22 Motion for Summary Judgment. By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (mnw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: AWUGAH v. KEY BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN AWUGAH
Represented By: GUY D. LORANGER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEY BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: ROBYN G. MARCH
Represented By: ABIGAIL C. VARGA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]