PORTLAND REGENCY INC et al v. RBS CITIZENS NA et al

Defendant: CITIZENS BANK NEW HAMPSHIRE and RBS CITIZENS NA
Plaintiff: PORTLAND REGENCY INC and TOP OF EXCHANGE LLC
Case Number: 2:2012cv00408
Filed: December 28, 2012
Court: Maine District Court
Office: Portland Office
County: Cumberland
Presiding Judge: D. BROCK HORNBY
Referring Judge: JOHN H. RICH
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 6, 2014 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON DEFENDANTS OBJECTION TO ORDEROF MAGISTRATE JUDGE reserving ruling to 99 Objection to 96 Report of Hearing and Order Re: Discovery Disputes. By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (nwd)
September 2, 2014 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON DISCOVERY DISPUTE re 99 Objection to 96 Report of Hearing and Order Re: Discovery Disputes - By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (mnw)
September 16, 2014 111 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT OF PRE-FILING CONFERENCE UNDER LOCAL RULE 56 - By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (mnw)
October 29, 2014 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO AMEND - granting 126 Motion to Amend. REMINDER: After entry of this Order, counsel are REQUIRED to separately file the AMENDED Documents. By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (mnw)
May 7, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT AND DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS - granting 17 Motion for Permission to File First Amended Complaint ; denying 16 Motion to Dismiss. Reminder: After entry of this Order, the plaintiffs shall separately file the First Amended Complaint document as a separate entry on the Court's docket. By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (mnw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PORTLAND REGENCY INC et al v. RBS CITIZENS NA et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITIZENS BANK NEW HAMPSHIRE
Represented By: JEFFREY GANZ
Represented By: BERNARD J. KUBETZ
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBS CITIZENS NA
Represented By: JEFFREY GANZ
Represented By: BERNARD J. KUBETZ
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PORTLAND REGENCY INC
Represented By: MATTHEW P. SCHAEFER
Represented By: MARTIN I. EISENSTEIN
Represented By: PETER J. BRANN
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TOP OF EXCHANGE LLC
Represented By: MATTHEW P. SCHAEFER
Represented By: MARTIN I. EISENSTEIN
Represented By: PETER J. BRANN
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]