HEARTS WITH HAITI INC et al v. KENDRICK

Defendant: PAUL KENDRICK
Plaintiff: MICHAEL GEILENFELD and HEARTS WITH HAITI INC
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00039
Filed: February 6, 2013
 
Court: Maine District Court
Office: Portland Office
County: Cumberland
Referring Judge: JOHN H. RICH
Presiding Judge: JOHN A. WOODCOCK
 
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 31, 2013 102 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part and denying in part 88 Motion for Reconsideration By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (jgw)
March 20, 2014 144 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 99 Motion for Sanctions. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (jlg)
October 21, 2013 81 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part and denying in part 49 Motion to Retain Classified Designation of Certain Documents; granting in part and denying in part 65 Motion to Amend Confidentiality Order; granting in part and denying in part 65 Motion to Retain Confidential Designations By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (jgw)
October 22, 2013 84 Featured Case ORDER adopting 73 Report and Recommended Decision for 13 and 52 Motions to Dismiss filed by PAUL KENDRICK; denying 13 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 52 Motion to Dismiss. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: HEARTS WITH HAITI INC et al v. KENDRICK
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL KENDRICK
Represented By: DAVID C. KING
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL GEILENFELD
Represented By: PETER J. DETROY, III
Represented By: RUSSELL PIERCE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEARTS WITH HAITI INC
Represented By: RUSSELL PIERCE
Represented By: PETER J. DETROY, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]