SHUPER v. CHANDLER et al

Defendant: PETER LEWIS, REBECCA CHANDLER, BILL KUHL and JOHN DESJARDINS
Plaintiff: ALLA I SHUPER
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00110
Filed: March 28, 2013
 
Court: Maine District Court
Office: Portland Office
County: Cumberland
Referring Judge: MARGARET J. KRAVCHUK
Presiding Judge: GEORGE Z. SINGAL
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 28, 2013 119 Featured Case ORDER ON PENDING MOTIONS & WARNING TO PLAINTIFF denying 115 Fifth Motion to Clarify; denying 116 Sixth Motion to Clarify; denying 117 Second Motion to Amend By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
December 23, 2013 134 Featured Case ORDER ON PENDING MOTIONS denying 97 Motion to Extend Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal; granting 99 Motion to Dismiss; denying 102 Motions for Clarification; denying 107 Motions for Clarification By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (nrg)
June 21, 2013 35 Featured Case ORDER ON MOTION TO DISMISS - granting 17 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (mnw)
July 8, 2013 55 Featured Case ORDER ON FIFTH AND SIXTH APPEAL re:denying 53 Appeal from Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court; denying 54 Appeal from Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (mjlt)
July 26, 2013 75 Featured Case ORDER ON MOTIONS TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS denying 61 and 73 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: SHUPER v. CHANDLER et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETER LEWIS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REBECCA CHANDLER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BILL KUHL
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DESJARDINS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLA I SHUPER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]