SD v. PORTLAND PUBLIC SCHOOLS

Plaintiff: SD
Defendant: PORTLAND PUBLIC SCHOOLS
Case Number: 2:2013cv00152
Filed: April 19, 2013
Court: Maine District Court
Office: Portland Office
County: Cumberland
Referring Judge: JOHN H. RICH
Presiding Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1400 Civil Rights of Handicapped Child
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 4, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD RE: 11 By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (dfr)
September 19, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS APPEAL OF THE ADMINISTRATIVE HEARING OFFICERS DECISION re 10 IDEA ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed under seal by SD (This document was filed in paper; no document attached) filed by SD, Set Deadlines: Parties to confer and file memorandum(s) by 10/3/2014. Memorandum and accompanying affidavits due by 10/3/2014. Response and reply to be filed in conformance to Local Rule 7. By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (nwd)
December 11, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON REIMBURSEMENT REMEDY By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (nwd)
December 11, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES granting in part 32 Motion for Attorney Fees By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (nwd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SD v. PORTLAND PUBLIC SCHOOLS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SD
Represented By: RICHARD L. O'MEARA
Represented By: NICOLE L. BRADICK
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PORTLAND PUBLIC SCHOOLS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]