Fulmore v. Premier Financial Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Lynn A. Fulmore
Defendant: Premier Financial Corporation and Sovereign Bank
Case Number: 1:2009cv02028
Filed: July 31, 2009
Court: Maryland District Court
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Baltimore City
Presiding Judge: J. Frederick Motz
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Negotiable Instrumen
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 9, 2009 145 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/9/09. (mcb, Deputy Clerk)
October 29, 2010 200 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 10/29/10. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-02028-JFM et al. (hml, Deputy Clerk)
February 8, 2011 213 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 2/8/11. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-02028-JFM et al.(hmls, Deputy Clerk)
March 4, 2011 217 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 3/4/11. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
July 31, 2009 45 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF OPINION. Signed by Judge Kaye A. Allison of the Circuit Court for Baltimore City, Maryland on 8/25/06. (ljs, Deputy Clerk)
July 31, 2009 46 Opinion or Order of the Court REVISED MEMORANDUM OF OPINION. Signed by Judge Kaye A. Allison of the Circuit Court for Baltimore City, Maryland on 9/11/06. (ljs, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fulmore v. Premier Financial Corporation et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn A. Fulmore
Represented By: E David Hoskins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier Financial Corporation
Represented By: Philip M Andrews
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sovereign Bank
Represented By: Gerard J Gaeng
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]