Assateague Coastkeeper et al v. Alan & Kristin Hudson Farm et al

Plaintiff: Assateague Coastkeeper, Assateague Coastal Trust, Kathy Phillips and Waterkeeper Alliance, Inc.
Defendant: Alan & Kristin Hudson Farm and Perdue Farms Inc.
Case Number: 1:2010cv00487
Filed: March 1, 2010
Court: Maryland District Court
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Worcester
Presiding Judge: William D Quarles
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365 Environmental Matters
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 20, 2012 211 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Judge William M Nickerson on 12/20/2012. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
August 27, 2013 243 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 215 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 227 Motion to Withdraw Appearance of Scott Edwards ; granting 228 Motion to Withdraw Appearance of Christopher T. Nidel. Signed by Judge William M Nickerson on 8/27/2013. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
July 21, 2010 26 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge William M Nickerson on 7/20/10. (mcb, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Assateague Coastkeeper et al v. Alan & Kristin Hudson Farm et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Assateague Coastkeeper
Represented By: Jane F Barrett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Assateague Coastal Trust
Represented By: Jane F Barrett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Phillips
Represented By: Jane F Barrett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waterkeeper Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: Jane F Barrett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan & Kristin Hudson Farm
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perdue Farms Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]