Equal Rights Center v. Richman Property Services, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Equal Rights Center
Defendant: Richman Property Services, Inc. and Carrollton Associates Limited Partnership
 
Case Number: 1:2010cv03038
Filed: October 27, 2010
 
Court: Maryland District Court
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Frederick
Presiding Judge: J. Frederick Motz
 
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 28, 2012 133 Featured Case LETTER OPINION to Counsel. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 11/28/2012. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
February 15, 2013 143 Featured Case LETTER ORDER denying 135 MOTION to Take Deposition (Limited Depositions). Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 2/15/2013. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
May 27, 2014 201 Featured Case MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 5/27/2014. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
January 5, 2012 62 Featured Case LETTER ORDER granting in part and denying in part 58 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Conerning Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Responses. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 15/2012. (aos, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Equal Rights Center v. Richman Property Services, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Rights Center
Represented By: Howard N Feldman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richman Property Services, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrollton Associates Limited Partnership
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]