United States of America v. Shriner et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Robert Shriner and Scott Shriner
Case Number: 1:2011cv02929
Filed: October 13, 2011
Court: Maryland District Court
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Anne Arundel
Presiding Judge: Marvin J. Garbis
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 3, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 49 Motion for Prejudgment Attachment. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 1/2/14 (cags, Deputy Clerk)
January 24, 2014 58 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part 29 The United States' Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 35 Motion in Limine; and 28 Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment remains under consideration. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 1/23/14. (apls, Deputy Clerk)
March 13, 2014 62 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 28 Motion for Summary Judgment; and granting 29 United States' Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 3/12/14. (apls, Deputy Clerk)
March 20, 2014 65 Opinion or Order of the Court THIRD MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 36 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Marvin J. Garbis on 3/20/14. (apls, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Shriner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jonathan D Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Shriner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Shriner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.