Baehr et al v. The Creig Northrop Team, P.C. et al

Plaintiff: Patrick Baehr and Christine Baehr
Defendant: The Creig Northrop Team, P.C., Creighton Edward Northrop, III, Carla Northrop, Long & Foster Real Estate, Inc., Lindell C. Eagan and Lakeview Title Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv00933
Filed: March 27, 2013
Court: Maryland District Court
Office: Baltimore Office
County: Howard
Presiding Judge: William M Nickerson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331(a) Fed. Question: Real Property
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 2, 2015 132 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge William D Quarles, Jr on 3/2/2015. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
January 29, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge William D Quarles, Jr on 1/28/14. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
July 24, 2014 84 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge William D Quarles, Jr on 7/24/14. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baehr et al v. The Creig Northrop Team, P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Baehr
Represented By: Glenn Russell Donaldson
Represented By: Hannah Kon(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Gregory Todd Lawrence
Represented By: Eric Daniel Massof
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Baehr
Represented By: Glenn Russell Donaldson
Represented By: Hannah Kon(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Gregory Todd Lawrence
Represented By: Eric Daniel Massof
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Creig Northrop Team, P.C.
Represented By: Quincy M Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creighton Edward Northrop, III
Represented By: Quincy M Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carla Northrop
Represented By: Quincy M Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long & Foster Real Estate, Inc.
Represented By: Quincy M Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindell C. Eagan
Represented By: Quincy M Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakeview Title Company, Inc.
Represented By: Quincy M Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.