Animal Welfare Institute et al v. Beech Ridge Energy LLC et al

Plaintiff: Animal Welfare Institute, Mountain Communities for Responsible Energy and David G. Cowan
Defendant: Beech Ridge Energy LLC and Invenergy Wind LLC
 
Case Number: 8:2009cv01519
Filed: June 10, 2009
 
Court: Maryland District Court
Office: Greenbelt Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Roger W Titus
 
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 16:1538 Endangered Species Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 14, 2013 101 Opinion or Order of the Court MODIFICATION OF STIPULATION. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 03/14/2013. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
December 8, 2009 62 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 12/8/2009. (kn, Deputy Clerk)
November 15, 2011 94 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER GRANTING 90 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and STRIKING the appearances of Kirsten L. Nathanson, Clifford Zatz,Jessica Anne Hall, Joseph Michael Klise, Steven P. Quarles, and Thomas R. Lunquist. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 11/15/11. (cms, Deputy Clerk)
November 16, 2011 95 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER CLOSING this case. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 11/15/11. (cms, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Animal Welfare Institute et al v. Beech Ridge Energy LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Animal Welfare Institute
Represented By: William K Meyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mountain Communities for Responsible Energy
Represented By: William K Meyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David G. Cowan
Represented By: William K Meyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beech Ridge Energy LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Invenergy Wind LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]