Khosmukhamedov et al v. Potomac Electric Power Company

Plaintiff: Izatullo Khosmukhamedov and Zoulfia Issaeva
Defendant: Potomac Electric Power Company
Case Number: 8:2011cv00449
Filed: February 18, 2011
Court: Maryland District Court
Office: Greenbelt Office
County: Prince George's
Presiding Judge: Alexander Williams
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 17, 2012 46 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 4/17/2012. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
May 11, 2012 50 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 5/11/2012. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
February 19, 2013 67 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Alexander Williams, Jr on 02/19/2013. (bas, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khosmukhamedov et al v. Potomac Electric Power Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Izatullo Khosmukhamedov
Represented By: Michael David Stallings
Represented By: Owen Joseph Curley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zoulfia Issaeva
Represented By: Owen Joseph Curley
Represented By: Michael David Stallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Potomac Electric Power Company
Represented By: Mark A Freeman
Represented By: Thomas R Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.