Avritt et al v. ReliaStar Life Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Jacqueline Avritt and Alan Avritt
Defendant: ReliaStar Life Insurance Company
 
Case Number: 0:2007cv01817
Filed: April 9, 2007
 
Court: Minnesota District Court
Office: DMN Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Paul A. Magnuson
Referring Judge: Janie S. Mayeron
 
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 23, 2009 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 67 Motion to Certify Class; denying 99 Motion to Exclude; granting 115 Motion for Leave to File; denying 121 Motion to Strike (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on February 23, 2009. (slf)
June 18, 2009 188 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS ORDERED THAT:1.The parties may make such filings as are necessary to establish that Plaintiffs claims satisfy the amount-in-controversy requirement of 28 U.S.C. § 1332(a). If no such showing is made on or before June 25, 2009, the Court will dismiss this action for lack of subject matter jurisdiction.(Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on June 18, 2009. (slf)
June 26, 2009 191 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE for lack of subject matter jurisdiction(Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on June 26, 2009. (slf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Avritt et al v. ReliaStar Life Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Avritt
Represented By: Christopher W Tompkins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Avritt
Represented By: Christopher W Tompkins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ReliaStar Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Timothy D Kelly
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]