Reuer et al v. Grand Casino Hinckley et al

Plaintiff: John H. Reuer and Larry R. Maetzold
Defendant: Grand Casino Hinckley and Grand Casino's, Inc.
 
Case Number: 0:2009cv01798
Filed: July 13, 2009
 
Court: Minnesota District Court
Office: DMN Office
County: Pine
Presiding Judge: Davis
Referring Judge: Erickson
 
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 24, 2010 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 47 Report and Recommendation. (Written Opinion) Motion to Postpone the Hearing and to Compel the Prduction of Documents 27 28 are Denied. The Motion to Dismiss 12 is Granted. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 8/24/10. (KMW)
August 5, 2009 4 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 1. That the Clerk of Court shall not issue a Summons, nor deliver process to the United States Marshal for service upon the Defendants, until so directed by further Order of the Court. 2. That the Plaintiffs' respective Applications for in forma pauperis status Docket Nos. 2 and 3 be denied. Objections to R&R due by 8/21/2009. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Raymond L. Erickson on 08/05/2009. (jz)
August 25, 2009 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ACCEPTING THE FILING FEE re 4 Report and Recommendation. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 8/25/09. (KMW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Reuer et al v. Grand Casino Hinckley et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John H. Reuer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry R. Maetzold
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand Casino Hinckley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand Casino's, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]