Wilson v. Astrue et al

Plaintiff: LaDoris Wilson
Defendant: Michael Astrue
 
Case Number: 0:2010cv00418
Filed: February 16, 2010
 
Court: Minnesota District Court
County: Ramsey
Referring Judge: Boylan
Presiding Judge: Davis
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 16, 2011 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 22 Report and Recommendation. (Written Opinion). The Court ADOPTS the Magistrate Judges Report andRecommendation dated February 11, 2011 22 . Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment 11 is GRANTED and the order of the Administrative Law Judge isREVERSED. Commissioners Motion for Summary Judgment 17 is DENIED.Judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff, thereby granting her benefits. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 3/16/11. (KMW)
September 15, 2011 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 33 Report and Recommendation (Written Opinion). Based upon the Report and Recommendation of United States MagistrateJudge Arthur J. Boylan, no objections filed in this matter, and after an independen treview of the files, records and proceedings in the above-titled matter, IT IS ORDEREDthat Wilson be awarded attorney fees in the amount of $4,874.84, pursuant to the EqualAccess to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C. § 2412. 28 .Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 9/15/11. (KMW)
January 9, 2012 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees Pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 406(b) is GRANTED. 2. Counsel Ethel J. Schaen and Thomas A. Krause are awarded attorney fees in the amount of $16,248.0 0. 3. Counsel Ethel J. Schaen and Thomas A. Krause will refund to Plaintiff attorney fees in the amount of $4,874.84, which recovered under the Equal Access to Justice Act. (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 1/8/12. (GRR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Wilson v. Astrue et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaDoris Wilson
Represented By: Ethel J Schaen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]