Marvin Lumber and Cedar Company et al v. Sapa Extrusions, Inc.

Plaintiff: Marvin Lumber and Cedar Company and Marvin Windows of Tennessee, Inc.
Defendant: Sapa Extrusions, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2010cv03881
Filed: September 9, 2010
Court: Minnesota District Court
Office: DMN Office
County: Roseau
Referring Judge: Leo I. Brisbois
Presiding Judge: Richard H. Kyle
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 30, 2012 194 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING the hearing on 110 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment to 10:00 a.m. on Friday, July 13, 2012, Courtroom 2, U.S. Courthouse, Fergus Falls, MN; Marvin's Reply Memorandum shall be served and filed on or before June 7, 2012. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 05/30/12. (kll)
July 20, 2012 224 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Continuing the trial in this action to the Court's April 2013 trial calendar; setting briefing of the parties' yet-to-be-filed Daubert Motions and the parties will be ordered to participate in settlement proceedings following disposit ion of the Daubert motions; the Court will set the summary-judgment briefing schedule should settlement prove unsuccessful; CONTUING sine die the September 20, 2012 and October 8, 2012 Summary Judgment Motion hearings; RESERVING RULING on 110 Marvin's recently argued Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 07/20/12. (kll)
September 7, 2012 246 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting briefing schedule on 226 MOTION to Strike Defendant's Expert Rebuttal Report. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 09/07/12. (kll)
September 9, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that all proceedings before Judge Kyle (motions, trial, etc.) will be held in the U.S. Courthouse in Fergus Falls, Minnesota. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 09/09/10. (kll)
April 18, 2013 409 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 263 Motion; denying 267 Motion; denying 271 Motion; denying 274 Motion; denying 277 Motion; denying 283 Motion; denying 286 Motion; denying 289 Motion; denying 292 Motion; denying 295 Motion; denying 299 Motion. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 04/18/13. (kll)
August 2, 2013 478 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION re 474 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and on Motion for Summary Judgment. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 08/02/13. (kll) Modified docket text on 8/2/2013 (TSS).
August 2, 2013 479 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION re 474 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and on Motion for Summary Judgment. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 08/02/13. (kll) Modified on docket text 8/2/2013 (TSS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marvin Lumber and Cedar Company et al v. Sapa Extrusions, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Lumber and Cedar Company
Represented By: Donald J Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Windows of Tennessee, Inc.
Represented By: Donald J Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sapa Extrusions, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]