Banks et al v. Shapiro & Zielke, LLP

Appellant: Edward D. Banks and Diane M. Banks
Appellee: Shapiro & Zielke, LLP
 
Case Number: 0:2010cv04972
Filed: December 23, 2010
 
Court: Minnesota District Court
Office: DMN Office
County: Ramsey
Referring Judge: Jeffrey J. Keyes
Presiding Judge: Richard H. Kyle
 
Nature of Suit: Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 14, 2011 17 Featured Case ORDER VACATING IN PART, nunc pro tunc to January 11, 2011 8 Order on Motion. The Courts prior Order is AMENDED as follows: the reference of Plaintiffs claim against Shapiro & Zielke to the Bankruptcy Court is WITHDRAWN; the remainder of this case s hall remain before the Bankruptcy Court. The Clerk of this Court is DIRECTED to amend the caption in this action (Civ. No. 10-4972) to reflect that only Shapiro & Zielke is named as a Defendant. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 04/14/11. (kll)
June 21, 2011 26 Featured Case ORDER Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. No. 19) currently set for July 13, 2011, is CONTINUED sine die; the parties SHALL complete their briefing on the Summary-Judgment Motion as originally scheduled despite this continuance, with the responsive memorandum due 21 days before the original hearing date and the reply due 14 days prior to the original hearing date. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 06/21/11. (kll)
May 22, 2012 41 Featured Case ORDER Dismissing this action With Prejudice re 40 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 05/22/12. (kll)
January 11, 2011 8 Featured Case ORDER granting 1 Motion to Withdraw Reference; directing Clerk of Bankruptcy Court to transmit the docket and all documents in Adv. No. 10-3216 to the Clerk of this Court. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 01/11/11. (kll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Banks et al v. Shapiro & Zielke, LLP
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Edward D. Banks
Represented By: Daniel M Eaton
Represented By: Carl E Christensen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Diane M. Banks
Represented By: Carl E Christensen
Represented By: Daniel M Eaton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Shapiro & Zielke, LLP
Represented By: Thomas J Hainje
Represented By: John G Westrick
Represented By: Lawrence P Zielke
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]