Ellis, et al. v. City of Minneapolis, et al.

Defendant: City of St. Paul, Metropolitan Council, John Does, City of Minneapolis and Jane Does
Plaintiff: Michael W. Blodgett, United States of America, ex rel., Andrew Ellis and Harriet Ellis
 
Case Number: 0:2011cv00416
Filed: February 18, 2011
 
Court: Minnesota District Court
Office: DMN Office
County: Hennepin
Referring Judge: Tony N. Leung
Presiding Judge: Patrick J. Schiltz
 
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 21, 2012 125 Featured Case ORDER - The motion of defendant City of St. Paul to dismiss the complaint 39 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The motion of defendant City of Minneapolis to dismiss the complaint 41 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The motion of defendant Metropolitan Council to dismiss the complaint 47 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The motions of relator Michael W. Blodgett to amend the complaint 34 , 53 , and 57 are DENIED. The motion of relator Michael W. Blodgett for a continuance 55 is DENIED AS MOOT . The motion of relators Andrew and Harriet Ellis for a hearing regarding discovery issues 73 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. This action will be dismissed with prejudice on account of relators' failure to comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 8 unless r elators file an amended complaint that complies with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Local Rules of the District of Minnesota, and this order no later than January 31, 2013. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 12/21/12.(bjs)
February 15, 2013 136 Featured Case ORDER (Written Opinion) - The amended complaint of relators Andrew Ellis and Harriet Ellis 127 is STRICKEN. The amended complaint of relator Michael W. Blodgett 129 is STRICKEN. Defendants' motion for an extension of time to file an answe r or otherwise respond to the amended complaints 132 is DENIED AS MOOT. This action will be dismissed with prejudice unless relators file either an amended complaint or a motion to sever no later than February 28, 2013. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 02/15/13. (bjs) Modified on 2/15/2013 (kt).
September 25, 2013 172 Featured Case ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Relator Michael W. Blodgett's objection 163 is OVERRULED. 2. The July 12, 2013 order 157 is AFFIRMED. 3. Blodgett is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE from this case. 4. This action will be dismissed unless relators Andrew and Harriet Ellis file an amended complaint no later than October 2, 2013. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on September 25, 2013. (CLG)
October 24, 2013 194 Featured Case ORDER denying 190 Motion to Alter/Amend/Correct Judgment (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 10/24/13. (BJS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ellis, et al. v. City of Minneapolis, et al.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of St. Paul
Represented By: Portia M Hampton-Flowers
Represented By: Judith A Hanson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Council
Represented By: Mary G Dobbins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Minneapolis
Represented By: Tracey N Fussy
Represented By: Sara J Lathrop
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael W. Blodgett
Represented By: Mitchell R Hadler
Represented By: May Chee Yang
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America, ex rel.
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Ellis
Represented By: John R Shoemaker
Represented By: Paul F Shoemaker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harriet Ellis
Represented By: John R Shoemaker
Represented By: Paul F Shoemaker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]