Zard v. Groupon, Inc. Featured Case

Lawsuit seeks class-action status against Groupon for allegedly selling consumers gift certificates with "illegal expiration dates." under federal and state law.

Plaintiff: Brian Zard
Defendant: Groupon, Inc.
 
Case Number: 0:2011cv00605
Filed: March 8, 2011
 
Court: Minnesota District Court
Office: DMN Office
County: Hennepin
Presiding Judge: Paul A. Magnuson
Referring Judge: Franklin L. Noel
 
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 15:1693
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 6, 2011 NOTICE: The case has been transferred/extracted to the Southern District of California. (akl)
June 6, 2011 10 CERTIFIED COPY OF TRANSFER ORDER, transferring case to the Southern District of California per MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge Dana M. Sabraw. (akl)
May 17, 2011 9 *TEXT ONLY ENTRY* NOTICE of Cancelation of Hearing: 8 NOTICE of Rule 16 Pretrial Conference set for June 8, 2011 @ 10:00 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 734 (STP) before Judge Paul A. Magnuson is canceled. Counsel will be notified when a new date and time are set. (smr) (smr)
May 12, 2011 8 NOTICE of RULE 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for June 8, 2011 @ 10:00 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 734 (STP) before Judge Paul A. Magnuson. (smr)
April 7, 2011 7 Featured Case ORDER: Groupon, Inc.'s time to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint shall be extended until (i) 45 days after the filing of a Consolidated Amended Complaint or whatever other deadline is set by the transferee court, in the event the JPML grants the MDL Motion, or (ii) 45 days after service of the JPML's decision on the MDL Motion to consolidate or whatever deadline is set by this Court, in the event the JPML denies the MDL Motion to consolidate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 4/6/11. (akl)
April 6, 2011 6 STIPULATION to Extend Time by Groupon, Inc., Brian Zard. (Bona, Jarod)
March 29, 2011 5 Featured Case ORDER: Groupon, Inc. answer due 5/5/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 3/28/11. (akl)
March 25, 2011 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jarod M Bona on behalf of Groupon, Inc.. (Bona, Jarod)
March 24, 2011 3 STIPULATION to Extend Time by Groupon, Inc., Brian Zard. (Bona, Jarod)
March 24, 2011 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jarod M Bona on behalf of Groupon, Inc.. (Bona, Jarod)
March 8, 2011 Summons Issued as to Groupon, Inc. (MMP)
March 8, 2011 1 COMPLAINT against Groupon, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 4052839.) assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per Master List referred to Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. Filed by Brian Zard. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (MMP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Zard v. Groupon, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Zard
Represented By: Andrew-NA S Friedman
Represented By: Todd-NA D. Carpenter
Represented By: Elaine-NA A Ryan
Represented By: Myles A Schneider
Represented By: Patricia-NA N Syverson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Groupon, Inc.
Represented By: Jarod M Bona
Represented By: Shirli-NA F. Weiss
Represented By: Christopher-NA M. Young
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]