Brady et al v. National Football League et al Featured Case

The National Football League Players Association (NFLPA) lockout lawsuit against the NFL

Defendant: Pro-Football, Inc., Chargers Football Company, LLC, National Football League, Arizona Cardinals Football Club, Inc., Atlanta Falcons Football Club, LLC, Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership, Buffalo Bills, Inc., Panthers Football, LLC, Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., The, Cinncinnati Bengals, Inc., Cleveland Browns Football Company LLC, Minnesota Vikings Football, LLC, New England Patriots LP, New Orleans Louisiana Saints, LLC, New York Football Giants, Inc., New York Jets LLC, Oakland Raiders LP, The, Philadelphia Eagles, LLC, Pittsburgh Steelers Sports, Inc., San Francisco Forty Niners Ltd., Football Northwest LLC, Buccaneers Limited Partnership, Tennessee Football, Inc., PDB Sports, Ltd., St. Louis Rams Partnership, The, Jacksonville Jaguars, Ltd., Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc., Miami Dolphins, Ltd., Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., Detroit Lions, Inc., The, Green Bay Packers, Inc., Houston NFL Holdings, LP and Indianapolis Colts, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tom Brady, Drew Brees, Vincent Jackson, Ben Leber, Logan Mankins, Peyton Manning, Von Miller, Brian Robison, Osi Umenyiora, Mike Vrabel, Carl Eller, Priest Holmes, Obafemi Ayanbadejo, Ryan Collins and Antawan Walker
 
Case Number: 0:2011cv00639
Filed: March 11, 2011
 
Court: Minnesota District Court
Office: DMN Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Jeanne J. Graham
Presiding Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
 
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
July 22, 2011 182 Featured Case ORDER THAT: the briefing schedule for the August 29, 2011 hearing on the dispositive motion by the NFL Defendants is altered such that the NFL Defendants' opening memorandum and supporting documents must be filed no later than August 1, 2011. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 7/22/11. (jam)
July 22, 2011 181 Second MOTION for Extension of Time of Briefing Schedule (Amended) by Arizona Cardinals Football Club, Inc., Atlanta Falcons Football Club, LLC, Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership, Tom Brady, Drew Brees, Buccaneers Limited Partnership, Buffalo Bills, Inc., Chargers Football Company, LLC, Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., The, Cinncinnati Bengals, Inc., Cleveland Browns Football Company LLC, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., Detroit Lions, Inc., The, Football Northwest LLC, Green Bay Packers, Inc., Houston NFL Holdings, LP, Indianapolis Colts, Inc., Vincent Jackson, Jacksonville Jaguars, Ltd., Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc., Ben Leber, Logan Mankins, Peyton Manning, Miami Dolphins, Ltd., Von Miller, Minnesota Vikings Football, LLC, National Football League, New England Patriots LP, New Orleans Louisiana Saints, LLC, New York Football Giants, Inc., New York Jets LLC, Oakland Raiders LP, The, PDB Sports, Ltd., Panthers Football, LLC, Philadelphia Eagles, LLC, Pittsburgh Steelers Sports, Inc., Pro-Football, Inc., Rams Football Co, LLC, The, Brian Robison, San Diego Chargers Football Co., San Francisco Forty Niners Ltd., St. Louis Rams Partnership, The, Tennessee Football, Inc., Osi Umenyiora, Mike Vrabel, Washington Football Inc.. (Connolly, Daniel)
July 19, 2011 180 Featured Case ORDER THAT: the briefing schedule for the August 29, 2011 hearing on the dispositive motions by the Brady Plaintiffs and the NFL Defendants is altered such that the opening memoranda and supporting documents must be filed no later than July 25, 2011. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 7/19/11. (jam)
July 19, 2011 179 Featured Case ORDER THAT: Defendants' motion to dismiss the Eller Plaintiffs First Amended Class Action Complaint (Dkt. No. 137) is rescheduled for hearing on October 4, 2011 at 9:30 a.m. before the Honorable Susan Richard Nelson, United States District Judge, Courtroom 7B, United States District Court, 774 Federal Building, 316 N. Robert Street, St. Paul, MN 55106. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 7/19/11. (jam)
July 19, 2011 178 Featured Case ORDER granting 175 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 7/19/11. (RLR)
July 19, 2011 177 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time of Briefing Schedule (Joint) by Arizona Cardinals Football Club, Inc., Atlanta Falcons Football Club, LLC, Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership, Tom Brady, Drew Brees, Buccaneers Limited Partnership, Buffalo Bills, Inc., Chargers Football Company, LLC, Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., The, Cinncinnati Bengals, Inc., Cleveland Browns Football Company LLC, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., Detroit Lions, Inc., The, Football Northwest LLC, Green Bay Packers, Inc., Houston NFL Holdings, LP, Indianapolis Colts, Inc., Vincent Jackson, Jacksonville Jaguars, Ltd., Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc., Ben Leber, Logan Mankins, Peyton Manning, Miami Dolphins, Ltd., Von Miller, Minnesota Vikings Football, LLC, National Football League, New England Patriots LP, New Orleans Louisiana Saints, LLC, New York Football Giants, Inc., New York Jets LLC, Oakland Raiders LP, The, PDB Sports, Ltd., Panthers Football, LLC, Philadelphia Eagles, LLC, Pittsburgh Steelers Sports, Inc., Pro-Football, Inc., Rams Football Co, LLC, The, Brian Robison, San Diego Chargers Football Co., San Francisco Forty Niners Ltd., St. Louis Rams Partnership, The, Tennessee Football, Inc., Osi Umenyiora, Mike Vrabel, Washington Football Inc.. (Connolly, Daniel)
July 19, 2011 176 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time / Reschedule Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Joint) by Arizona Cardinals Football Club, Inc., Atlanta Falcons Football Club, LLC, Obafemi Ayanbadejo, Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership, Buccaneers Limited Partnership, Buffalo Bills, Inc., Chargers Football Company, LLC, Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., The, Cinncinnati Bengals, Inc., Cleveland Browns Football Company LLC, Ryan Collins, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., Detroit Lions, Inc., The, Carl Eller, Football Northwest LLC, Green Bay Packers, Inc., Priest Holmes, Houston NFL Holdings, LP, Indianapolis Colts, Inc., Jacksonville Jaguars, Ltd., Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc., Miami Dolphins, Ltd., Minnesota Vikings Football, LLC, National Football League, New England Patriots LP, New Orleans Louisiana Saints, LLC, New York Football Giants, Inc., New York Jets LLC, Oakland Raiders LP, The, PDB Sports, Ltd., Panthers Football, LLC, Philadelphia Eagles, LLC, Pittsburgh Steelers Sports, Inc., Pro-Football, Inc., Rams Football Co, LLC, The, San Diego Chargers Football Co., San Francisco Forty Niners Ltd., St. Louis Rams Partnership, The, Tennessee Football, Inc., Antawan Walker, Washington Football Inc.. (Connolly, Daniel)
July 19, 2011 175 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time / Reschedule Hearing and Extend Briefing Schedule on Eller Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend (Joint) by Arizona Cardinals Football Club, Inc., Atlanta Falcons Football Club, LLC, Obafemi Ayanbadejo, Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership, Buccaneers Limited Partnership, Buffalo Bills, Inc., Chargers Football Company, LLC, Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., The, Cinncinnati Bengals, Inc., Cleveland Browns Football Company LLC, Ryan Collins, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., Detroit Lions, Inc., The, Carl Eller, Football Northwest LLC, Green Bay Packers, Inc., Priest Holmes, Houston NFL Holdings, LP, Indianapolis Colts, Inc., Jacksonville Jaguars, Ltd., Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc., Miami Dolphins, Ltd., Minnesota Vikings Football, LLC, National Football League, New England Patriots LP, New Orleans Louisiana Saints, LLC, New York Football Giants, Inc., New York Jets LLC, Oakland Raiders LP, The, PDB Sports, Ltd., Panthers Football, LLC, Philadelphia Eagles, LLC, Pittsburgh Steelers Sports, Inc., Pro-Football, Inc., Rams Football Co, LLC, The, San Diego Chargers Football Co., San Francisco Forty Niners Ltd., St. Louis Rams Partnership, The, Tennessee Football, Inc., Antawan Walker, Washington Football Inc.. (Connolly, Daniel)
July 18, 2011 174 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time /Rescheduling Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Arizona Cardinals Football Club, Inc., Atlanta Falcons Football Club, LLC, Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership, Buccaneers Limited Partnership, Buffalo Bills, Inc., Chargers Football Company, LLC, Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., The, Cinncinnati Bengals, Inc., Cleveland Browns Football Company LLC, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., Detroit Lions, Inc., The, Football Northwest LLC, Green Bay Packers, Inc., Houston NFL Holdings, LP, Indianapolis Colts, Inc., Jacksonville Jaguars, Ltd., Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc., Miami Dolphins, Ltd., Minnesota Vikings Football, LLC, National Football League, New England Patriots LP, New Orleans Louisiana Saints, LLC, New York Football Giants, Inc., New York Jets LLC, Oakland Raiders LP, The, PDB Sports, Ltd., Panthers Football, LLC, Philadelphia Eagles, LLC, Pittsburgh Steelers Sports, Inc., Pro-Football, Inc., Rams Football Co, LLC, The, San Diego Chargers Football Co., San Francisco Forty Niners Ltd., St. Louis Rams Partnership, The, Tennessee Football, Inc., Washington Football Inc., Obafemi Ayanbadejo, Tom Brady, Drew Brees, Ryan Collins, Carl Eller, Priest Holmes, Vincent Jackson, Ben Leber, Logan Mankins, Peyton Manning, Von Miller, Brian Robinson, Osi Umenyiora, Mike Vrabel, Antawan Walker. (Connolly, Daniel) Modified filers on 7/19/2011 (lmb).
July 18, 2011 173 Declaration of Barbara P. Berens in Support of 168 Memorandum in Support of Motion, filed by Tom Brady, Drew Brees, Vincent Jackson, Ben Leber, Logan Mankins, Peyton Manning, Von Miller, Brian Robison, Osi Umenyiora, Mike Vrabel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C, # 4 Exhibit(s) D, # 5 Exhibit(s) E, # 6 Exhibit(s) F (part 1), # 7 Exhibit(s) F (part 2), # 8 Exhibit(s) F (part 3), # 9 Exhibit(s) G, # 10 Exhibit(s) H)(Berens, Barbara)
July 18, 2011 172 Declaration of Osi Umenyiora in Support of 168 Memorandum in Support of Motion, filed by Tom Brady, Drew Brees, Vincent Jackson, Ben Leber, Logan Mankins, Peyton Manning, Von Miller, Brian Robison, Osi Umenyiora, Mike Vrabel. (Berens, Barbara)
July 18, 2011 171 Declaration of Brian Robison in Support of 168 Memorandum in Support of Motion, filed by Tom Brady, Drew Brees, Vincent Jackson, Ben Leber, Logan Mankins, Peyton Manning, Von Miller, Brian Robison, Osi Umenyiora, Mike Vrabel. (Berens, Barbara)
July 18, 2011 170 Declaration of Tom Brady in Support of 168 Memorandum in Support of Motion, filed by Tom Brady, Drew Brees, Vincent Jackson, Ben Leber, Logan Mankins, Peyton Manning, Von Miller, Brian Robison, Osi Umenyiora, Mike Vrabel. (Berens, Barbara)
July 18, 2011 169 Declaration of Drew Brees in Support of 168 Memorandum in Support of Motion, filed by Tom Brady, Drew Brees, Vincent Jackson, Ben Leber, Logan Mankins, Peyton Manning, Von Miller, Brian Robison, Osi Umenyiora, Mike Vrabel. (Berens, Barbara)
July 18, 2011 168 MEMORANDUM in Support re 166 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Tom Brady, Drew Brees, Vincent Jackson, Ben Leber, Logan Mankins, Peyton Manning, Von Miller, Brian Robison, Osi Umenyiora, Mike Vrabel. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Berens, Barbara)
July 18, 2011 167 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 166 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (Berens, Barbara)
July 18, 2011 166 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Tom Brady, Drew Brees, Vincent Jackson, Ben Leber, Logan Mankins, Peyton Manning, Von Miller, Brian Robison, Osi Umenyiora, Mike Vrabel. (Berens, Barbara)
July 18, 2011 165 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time of Briefing Schedule on Eller Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend and Reschedule Hearing by Arizona Cardinals Football Club, Inc., Atlanta Falcons Football Club, LLC, Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership, Buccaneers Limited Partnership, Buffalo Bills, Inc., Chargers Football Company, LLC, Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., The, Cinncinnati Bengals, Inc., Cleveland Browns Football Company LLC, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., Detroit Lions, Inc., The, Football Northwest LLC, Green Bay Packers, Inc., Houston NFL Holdings, LP, Indianapolis Colts, Inc., Jacksonville Jaguars, Ltd., Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc., Miami Dolphins, Ltd., Minnesota Vikings Football, LLC, National Football League, New England Patriots LP, New Orleans Louisiana Saints, LLC, New York Football Giants, Inc., New York Jets LLC, Oakland Raiders LP, The, PDB Sports, Ltd., Panthers Football, LLC, Philadelphia Eagles, LLC, Pittsburgh Steelers Sports, Inc., Pro-Football, Inc., Rams Football Co, LLC, The, San Diego Chargers Football Co., San Francisco Forty Niners Ltd., St. Louis Rams Partnership, The, Tennessee Football, Inc., Washington Football Inc.. (Connolly, Daniel)
July 18, 2011 164 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time of Briefing Schedule by Arizona Cardinals Football Club, Inc., Atlanta Falcons Football Club, LLC, Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership, Buccaneers Limited Partnership, Buffalo Bills, Inc., Chargers Football Company, LLC, Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., The, Cinncinnati Bengals, Inc., Cleveland Browns Football Company LLC, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., Detroit Lions, Inc., The, Football Northwest LLC, Green Bay Packers, Inc., Houston NFL Holdings, LP, Indianapolis Colts, Inc., Jacksonville Jaguars, Ltd., Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc., Miami Dolphins, Ltd., Minnesota Vikings Football, LLC, National Football League, New England Patriots LP, New Orleans Louisiana Saints, LLC, New York Football Giants, Inc., New York Jets LLC, Oakland Raiders LP, The, PDB Sports, Ltd., Panthers Football, LLC, Philadelphia Eagles, LLC, Pittsburgh Steelers Sports, Inc., Pro-Football, Inc., Rams Football Co, LLC, The, San Diego Chargers Football Co., San Francisco Forty Niners Ltd., St. Louis Rams Partnership, The, Tennessee Football, Inc., Washington Football Inc.. (Connolly, Daniel)
July 18, 2011 163 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Tom Brady, Drew Brees, Vincent Jackson, Ben Leber, Logan Mankins, Peyton Manning, Von Miller, Brian Robison, Osi Umenyiora, Mike Vrabel. (Berens, Barbara)
July 15, 2011 162 Featured Case ORDER (See Order): Settlement Conference set for 7/19/2011 08:00 AM in Judge's Chambers 9E (MPLS) before Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 07/15/2011. (lmb)
July 13, 2011 161 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Obafemi Ayanbadejo, Ryan Collins, Carl Eller re 157 Amended MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings Leave to Amend and Crossclaim (Stuckey, Shawn)
July 13, 2011 160 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Obafemi Ayanbadejo, Ryan Collins, Carl Eller re 159 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 158 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 157 Amended MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings Leave to Amend and Crossclaim (Stuckey, Shawn)
July 13, 2011 159 MEMORANDUM in Support re 157 Amended MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings Leave to Amend and Crossclaim filed by Obafemi Ayanbadejo, Ryan Collins, Carl Eller. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Stuckey, Shawn)
July 13, 2011 158 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 157 Amended MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings Leave to Amend and Crossclaim : Motion Hearing set for 8/8/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham. (Stuckey, Shawn)
July 13, 2011 157 Amended MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings Leave to Amend and Crossclaim by Obafemi Ayanbadejo, Ryan Collins, Carl Eller. (Attachments: # 1 Second Amended Complaint and Crossclaim, # 2 Exhibit Index to Second Amended Complaint and Crossclaim, # 3 Exhibit(s) A-O to Second Amended Complaint and Crossclaim, # 4 Exhibit(s) P to Second Amended Complaint and Crossclaim, # 5 Exhibit(s) Q-T to Second Amended Complaint and Crossclaim, # 6 Exhibit(s) U to Second Amended Complaint and Crossclaim, # 7 Exhibit(s) V-X to Second Amended Complaint and Crossclaim, # 8 Redlined Second Amended Complaint and Crossclaim)(Stuckey, Shawn)
July 12, 2011 156 Featured Case ORDER that if the Eller Plaintiffs intend to go forward with the motion hearing on August 8, 2011, they must re-file their motion to amend and supporting papers no later than Thursday, July 14, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 7/12/11. (akl)
July 9, 2011 155 TEXT ONLY ENTRY. Oral ORDER: WHEREAS, the undersigned Magistrate Judge has been engaged in court ordered mediation settlement discussions with the Brady Plaintiffs and the Defendants, and WHEREAS, the Court deems it necessary to order the principals of both parties to continue said effort, NOW THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the attorneys for the Brady Plaintiffs and the attorneys for the Defendant shall appear before the undersigned Magistrate Judge in Chambers 9E, 300 South Fourth Street, Minneapolis, Minnesota, at 8:00 a.m. on Tuesday, July 19, 2011. In addition to the attorneys, party representatives with full settlement authority shall appear at that time and place to continue settlement discussions.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that both sides shall meet and confer on various dates to be agreed upon by both sides prior to July 19, 2011, in an effort to define and narrow the differences between their respective settlement positions. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the attorneys shall be prepared to report to the undersigned Magistrate Judge during the evening hours on Monday, July 18, 2011, for an in-person agenda setting session with the attorneys, at a time to be determined. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 7/9/11. (kat)
July 8, 2011 154 USCA JUDGMENT as to 100 Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit: After consideration, it is hereby ordered and adjudged that the judgment of the district court in this cause is vacated and the cause is remanded to the district court for proceedings consistent with the opinion of this court. (received electronically from COA) (akl)
July 8, 2011 153 Opinion of USCA as to 100 Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit(Judge Bye, Judge Colloton, Judge Benton): The district court's order of April 25, 2011, granting a preliminary injunction is vacated, and the case is remanded for further proceedings. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter)(akl)
July 8, 2011 152 Featured Case ORDER of USCA as to 100 Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit: The second motion of National Football League Players Reserve for leave to intervene has been considered by the court and is denied. (received electronically from COA) (akl)
July 6, 2011 151 EXHIBIT: Redlined Second Amended Class Action Complaint and Crossclaims re 142 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings filed by Obafemi Ayanbadejo, Ryan Collins, Carl Eller. (Stuckey, Shawn) Modified text on 7/6/2011 (lmb).
July 5, 2011 150 Featured Case ORDER: 1. Defendants shall file their response to the motion, including memorandum and all supporting documents, on or before July 18, 2011; 2. Named Plaintiffs shall file their reply to Defendants response on or before July 25, 2011; and 3. The hearing on the motion will take place on Monday, August 8, 2011 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 3B, Warren E. Burger Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 316 North Robert Street, Saint Paul, Minnesota 55101. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 07/05/2011. (MMP)
July 5, 2011 149 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR, WILL RE-FILE. EXHIBIT re 142 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings Leave to Amend and Crossclaim Redlined Complaint by Obafemi Ayanbadejo, Ryan Collins, Carl Eller filed by Obafemi Ayanbadejo, Ryan Collins, Carl Eller. (Stuckey, Shawn) Modified on 7/6/2011 (JME).
July 5, 2011 148 DOCUMENT FILE IN ERROR, CAPTION INCORRECT, WILL RE-FILE. AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: 142 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings Leave to Amend and Crossclaim : Motion Hearing set for 8/8/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham. (Stuckey, Shawn) Modified on 7/7/2011 (JME).
July 5, 2011 147 Featured Case ORDER: that Tyrone Dwayne Miller's Motion Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 20 for Permissive Joinder of Parties (Doc. No. 141 ) is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 07/05/2011. (MMP)
July 4, 2011 146 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Obafemi Ayanbadejo, Ryan Collins, Carl Eller re 142 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings Leave to Amend and Crossclaim (Stuckey, Shawn)
July 4, 2011 145 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Obafemi Ayanbadejo, Ryan Collins, Carl Eller re 144 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 143 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 142 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings Leave to Amend and Crossclaim (Stuckey, Shawn)
July 4, 2011 144 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR, CAPTION INCORRECT, WILL RE-FILE. MEMORANDUM in Support re 142 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings Leave to Amend and Crossclaim filed by Obafemi Ayanbadejo, Ryan Collins, Carl Eller. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Stuckey, Shawn) Modified on 7/7/2011 (JME).
July 4, 2011 143 NOTICE OF HEARING ON 142 MOTION For Leave to File Second Amended Complaint and Crossclaim. To be heard at a date and time to be determined by The Court. (Stuckey, Shawn) Modified text and link on 7/5/2011 (lmb).
July 4, 2011 142 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR, CAPTION INCORRECT, WILL RE-FILE. MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings Leave to Amend and Crossclaim by Obafemi Ayanbadejo, Ryan Collins, Carl Eller. (Attachments: # 1 Second Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibit(s) Index, # 3 Exhibit(s) A, # 4 Exhibit(s) B, # 5 Exhibit(s) C, # 6 Exhibit(s) D, # 7 Exhibit(s) E, # 8 Exhibit(s) F, # 9 Exhibit(s) G, # 10 Exhibit(s) H, # 11 Exhibit(s) I, # 12 Exhibit(s) J, # 13 Exhibit(s) K, # 14 Exhibit(s) L, # 15 Exhibit(s) M, # 16 Exhibit(s) N, # 17 Exhibit(s) O, # 18 Exhibit(s) P, # 19 Exhibit(s) Q, # 20 Exhibit(s) R, # 21 Exhibit(s) S, # 22 Exhibit(s) T, # 23 Exhibit(s) U, # 24 Exhibit(s) V, # 25 Exhibit(s) W, # 26 Exhibit(s) X)(Stuckey, Shawn) Modified on 7/7/2011 (JME).
June 17, 2011 141 MOTION to Intervene by Tyrone Dwayne Miller. (TSS)
June 10, 2011 140 SEALED ORDER. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan on June 09, 2011. (TSS)
June 8, 2011 139 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: 137 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (Connolly, Daniel)
June 6, 2011 138 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 137 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (Connolly, Daniel)
June 6, 2011 137 MOTION to Dismiss/General by Arizona Cardinals Football Club, Inc., Atlanta Falcons Football Club, LLC, Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership, Buccaneers Limited Partnership, Buffalo Bills, Inc., Chargers Football Company, LLC, Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., The, Cinncinnati Bengals, Inc., Cleveland Browns Football Company LLC, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., Detroit Lions, Inc., The, Football Northwest LLC, Green Bay Packers, Inc., Houston NFL Holdings, LP, Indianapolis Colts, Inc., Jacksonville Jaguars, Ltd., Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc., Miami Dolphins, Ltd., Minnesota Vikings Football, LLC, National Football League, New England Patriots LP, New Orleans Louisiana Saints, LLC, New York Football Giants, Inc., New York Jets LLC, Oakland Raiders LP, The, PDB Sports, Ltd., Panthers Football, LLC, Philadelphia Eagles, LLC, Pittsburgh Steelers Sports, Inc., Pro-Football, Inc., Rams Football Co, LLC, The, San Diego Chargers Football Co., San Francisco Forty Niners Ltd., St. Louis Rams Partnership, The, Tennessee Football, Inc., Washington Football Inc.. (Connolly, Daniel)
June 2, 2011 136 Featured Case ORDER: Whereas, the Court has been engaged in confidential settlement discussions involving the above captioned matter, it deems it appropriate to cancel the mediation session previously scheduled in Minneapolis for June 7 and June 8. Therefore, the Court hereby cancels the mediation on June 7, 2011, and June 8, 2011, in Chambers 9E of the United States Courthouse, 300 South Fourth Street, Minneapolis, Minnesota. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 06/02/2011. (lmb)
May 24, 2011 135 Featured Case ORDER of USCA as to 100 Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit,: Appellants Motion to file an overlength reply brief of up to 9,000 words is granted. (received electronically from COA) (jam)
May 23, 2011 133 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 127 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re VACATING 129 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 5/23/11. (RLR)
May 20, 2011 134 Featured Case ORDER of USCA as to 100 Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit, re: Appellees motion for leave to file an overlength brief of 18,000 words is granted. (received electronically from COA) (jam)
May 20, 2011 132 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 127 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to First Amended Class Action Complaint Brady Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Extend the Time to Respond to First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Tom Brady, Drew Brees, Vincent Jackson, Ben Leber, Logan Mankins, Peyton Manning, Von Miller, Brian Robison, Osi Umenyiora, Mike Vrabel. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Berens, Barbara)
May 20, 2011 131 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE-MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 127 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to First Amended Class Action Complaint Brady Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Extend the Time to Respond to First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Tom Brady, Drew Brees, Vincent Jackson, Ben Leber, Logan Mankins, Peyton Manning, Von Miller, Brian Robison, Osi Umenyiora, Mike Vrabel. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Berens, Barbara) Modified on 5/20/2011 (akl).
May 20, 2011 130 LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Arizona Cardinals Football Club, Inc., Atlanta Falcons Football Club, LLC, Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership, Buccaneers Limited Partnership, Buffalo Bills, Inc., Chargers Football Company, LLC, Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., The, Cinncinnati Bengals, Inc., Cleveland Browns Football Company LLC, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., Detroit Lions, Inc., The, Football Northwest LLC, Green Bay Packers, Inc., Houston NFL Holdings, LP, Indianapolis Colts, Inc., Jacksonville Jaguars, Ltd., Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc., Miami Dolphins, Ltd., Minnesota Vikings Football, LLC, National Football League, New England Patriots LP, New Orleans Louisiana Saints, LLC, New York Football Giants, Inc., New York Jets LLC, Oakland Raiders LP, The, PDB Sports, Ltd., Panthers Football, LLC, Philadelphia Eagles, LLC, Pittsburgh Steelers Sports, Inc., Pro-Football, Inc., Rams Football Co, LLC, The, San Diego Chargers Football Co., San Francisco Forty Niners Ltd., St. Louis Rams Partnership, The, Tennessee Football, Inc., Washington Football Inc. re 128 Memorandum in Support of Motion, filed by Arizona Cardinals Football Club, Inc., Atlanta Falcons Football Club, LLC, Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership, Buccaneers Limited Partnership, Buffalo Bills, Inc., Chargers Football Company, LLC, Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., The, Cinncinnati Bengals, Inc., Cleveland Browns Football Company LLC, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., Detroit Lions, Inc., The, Football Northwest LLC, Green Bay Packers, Inc., Houston NFL Holdings, LP, Indianapolis Colts, Inc., Jacksonville Jaguars, Ltd., Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc., Miami Dolphins, Ltd., Minnesota Vikings Football, LLC, National Football League, New England Patriots LP, New Orleans Louisiana Saints, LLC, New York Football Giants, Inc., New York Jets LLC, Oakland Raiders LP, The, PDB Sports, Ltd., Panthers Football, LLC, Philadelphia Eagles, LLC, Pittsburgh Steelers Sports, Inc., Pro-Football, Inc., Rams Football Co, LLC, The, San Diego Chargers Football Co., San Francisco Forty Niners Ltd., St. Louis Rams Partnership, The, Tennessee Football, Inc., Washington Football Inc. (Connolly, Daniel)
May 19, 2011 129 Featured Case VACATED per ORDER 133 dated 05/23/2011. ORDER granting 125 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer Arizona Cardinals Football Club, Inc. answer due 7/6/2011; Atlanta Falcons Football Club, LLC answer due 7/6/2011; Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership answer due 7/6/2011; Buccaneers Limited Partnership answer due 7/6/2011; Buffalo Bills, Inc. answer due 7/6/2011; Chargers Football Company, LLC answer due 7/6/2011; Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., The answer due 7/6/2011; Cinncinnati Bengals, Inc. answer due 7/6/2011; Cleveland Browns Football Company LLC answer due 7/6/2011; Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd. answer due 7/6/2011; Detroit Lions, Inc., The answer due 7/6/2011; Football Northwest LLC answer due 7/6/2011; Green Bay Packers, Inc. answer due 7/6/2011; Houston NFL Holdings, LP answer due 7/6/2011; Indianapolis Colts, Inc. answer due 7/6/2011; Jacksonville Jaguars, Ltd. answer due 7/6/2011; Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc. answer due 7/6/2011; Miami Dolphins, Ltd. answer due 7/6/2011; Minnesota Vikings Football, LLC answer due 7/6/2011; National Football League answer due 7/6/2011; New England Patriots LP answer due 7/6/2011; New Orleans Louisiana Saints, LLC answer due 7/6/2011; New York Football Giants, Inc. answer due 7/6/2011; New York Jets LLC answer due 7/6/2011; Oakland Raiders LP, The answer due 7/6/2011; PDB Sports, Ltd. answer due 7/6/2011; Panthers Football, LLC answer due 7/6/2011; Philadelphia Eagles, LLC answer due 7/6/2011; Pittsburgh Steelers Sports, Inc. answer due 7/6/2011; Pro-Football, Inc. answer due 7/6/2011; Rams Football Co, LLC, The answer due 7/6/2011; San Diego Chargers Football Co. answer due 7/6/2011; San Francisco Forty Niners Ltd. answer due 7/6/2011; St. Louis Rams Partnership, The answer due 7/6/2011; Tennessee Football, Inc. answer due 7/6/2011; Washington Football Inc. answer due 7/6/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 5/19/11. (RLR) Modified link and text on 5/19/2011 (RLR). Modified text and link on 5/24/2011 (lmb).
May 19, 2011 128 MEMORANDUM in Support re 127 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Arizona Cardinals Football Club, Inc., Atlanta Falcons Football Club, LLC, Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership, Buccaneers Limited Partnership, Buffalo Bills, Inc., Chargers Football Company, LLC, Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., The, Cinncinnati Bengals, Inc., Cleveland Browns Football Company LLC, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., Detroit Lions, Inc., The, Football Northwest LLC, Green Bay Packers, Inc., Houston NFL Holdings, LP, Indianapolis Colts, Inc., Jacksonville Jaguars, Ltd., Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc., Miami Dolphins, Ltd., Minnesota Vikings Football, LLC, National Football League, New England Patriots LP, New Orleans Louisiana Saints, LLC, New York Football Giants, Inc., New York Jets LLC, Oakland Raiders LP, The, PDB Sports, Ltd., Panthers Football, LLC, Philadelphia Eagles, LLC, Pittsburgh Steelers Sports, Inc., Pro-Football, Inc., Rams Football Co, LLC, The, San Diego Chargers Football Co., San Francisco Forty Niners Ltd., St. Louis Rams Partnership, The, Tennessee Football, Inc., Washington Football Inc. (Connolly, Daniel)
May 19, 2011 127 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to First Amended Class Action Complaint by Arizona Cardinals Football Club, Inc., Atlanta Falcons Football Club, LLC, Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership, Buccaneers Limited Partnership, Buffalo Bills, Inc., Chargers Football Company, LLC, Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., The, Cinncinnati Bengals, Inc., Cleveland Browns Football Company LLC, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., Detroit Lions, Inc., The, Football Northwest LLC, Green Bay Packers, Inc., Houston NFL Holdings, LP, Indianapolis Colts, Inc., Jacksonville Jaguars, Ltd., Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc., Miami Dolphins, Ltd., Minnesota Vikings Football, LLC, National Football League, New England Patriots LP, New Orleans Louisiana Saints, LLC, New York Football Giants, Inc., New York Jets LLC, Oakland Raiders LP, The, PDB Sports, Ltd., Panthers Football, LLC, Philadelphia Eagles, LLC, Pittsburgh Steelers Sports, Inc., Pro-Football, Inc., Rams Football Co, LLC, The, San Diego Chargers Football Co., San Francisco Forty Niners Ltd., St. Louis Rams Partnership, The, Tennessee Football, Inc., Washington Football Inc. (Connolly, Daniel)
May 18, 2011 125 STIPULATION For Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead by Arizona Cardinals Football Club, Inc., Atlanta Falcons Football Club, LLC, Obafemi Ayanbadejo, Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership, Tom Brady, Drew Brees, Buccaneers Limited Partnership, Buffalo Bills, Inc., Chargers Football Company, LLC, Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., The, Cinncinnati Bengals, Inc., Cleveland Browns Football Company LLC, Ryan Collins, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., Detroit Lions, Inc., The, Carl Eller, Football Northwest LLC, Green Bay Packers, Inc., Priest Holmes, Houston NFL Holdings, LP, Indianapolis Colts, Inc., Vincent Jackson, Jacksonville Jaguars, Ltd., Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc., Ben Leber, Logan Mankins, Peyton Manning, Miami Dolphins, Ltd., Von Miller, Minnesota Vikings Football, LLC, National Football League, New England Patriots LP, New Orleans Louisiana Saints, LLC, New York Football Giants, Inc., New York Jets LLC, Oakland Raiders LP, The, PDB Sports, Ltd., Panthers Football, LLC, Philadelphia Eagles, LLC, Pittsburgh Steelers Sports, Inc., Pro-Football, Inc., Rams Football Co, LLC, The, Brian Robison, San Diego Chargers Football Co., San Francisco Forty Niners Ltd., St. Louis Rams Partnership, The, Tennessee Football, Inc., Osi Umenyiora, Mike Vrabel, Antawan Walker, Washington Football Inc.. (Connolly, Daniel)
May 17, 2011 126 Featured Case ORDER of USCA as to 100 Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit: Motion of National Football League Players' Reserve, for leave to intervene, has been considered by the court and is denied. (received electronically from COA) (jam)
May 17, 2011 124 Minute Entry for CONFERENCE held before Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 5/17/2011. Continued conference to be held on Tuesday, June 7, 2011, at 10:00 a.m. and Wednesday, June 8, 2011 at 9:00 a.m. (lmb)
May 16, 2011 123 Minute Entry for CONFERENCE held before Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 5/16/2011. Discussions to continue on May 17, 2011. (lmb)
May 16, 2011 122 Featured Case ORDER of USCA as to 100 Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit, : For the reasons that follow, we now grant the League's motion for stay pending appeal. (received electronically from COA) (jam)
May 13, 2011 121 Featured Case ORDER of USCA as to 100 Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit, : Motion of interested party, National Hockey League, for leave to file amicus curiae brief on behalf of Appellants is granted. (received electronically from COA) (jam)
May 3, 2011 NOTICE to USCA of subsequent filing in a civil case, Re: Amended Complaint 119 . (lmb)
May 3, 2011 119 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Class Action Complaint against National Football League, Arizona Cardinals Football Club, Inc., Atlanta Falcons Football Club, LLC, Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership, Buffalo Bills, Inc., Panthers Football, LLC, The Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., Cincinnati Bengals, Inc., Cleveland Browns Football Company LLC, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., PDB Sports, Ltd. d/b/a The Denver Broncos Football Club, Ltd., The Detroit Lions, Inc., Green Bay Packers, Inc., Houston NFL Holdings, LP, Indianapolis Colts, Inc., Jacksonville Jaguars, Ltd., Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc., Miami Dolphins, Ltd., Minnesota Vikings Football, LLC, New England Patriots LP, New Orleans Louisiana Saints, LLC, New York Football Giants, Inc., New York Jets LLC , The Oakland Raiders LP, Philadelphia Eagles, LLC, Pittsburgh Steelers Sports, Inc., Chargers Football Company, LLC, San Francisco Forty Niners Ltd., Football Northwest LLC, The St. Louis Rams Partnership, Buccaneers Limited Partnership, Tennessee Football, Inc., Pro-Football, Inc., filed by Tom Brady, Mike Vrabel, Von Miller, Ben Leber, Drew Brees, Peyton Manning, Brian Robison, Osi Umenyiora, Logan Mankins, Vincent Jackson. (Berens, Barbara) Modified text on 5/3/2011 (lmb).
May 3, 2011 NOTICE to USCA of subsequent filing in a civil case, Re: Reply 114 , Order, 113 , Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 110 , Letter to District Judge, 108 , Letter to District Judge 115 , Order on Motion to Stay 117 , Letter to District Judge 112 , Declaration in Support 111 , Letter to District Judge 116 , Receipt 109 , Order, 107 . (akl)
April 29, 2011 120 Featured Case ORDER of USCA as to 100 Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit(Judge Bye, Judge Colloton, Judge Benton): The district court's order of April 25, 2011, is temporarily stayed. BYE, Circuit Judge, dissenting. (received electronically from COA) (akl)
April 27, 2011 117 Featured Case ORDER: Defendants' Motion to Stay Pending Appeal 101 is DENIED. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 04/27/2011. (jmf)
April 27, 2011 116 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Tom Brady, Drew Brees, Vincent Jackson, Ben Leber, Logan Mankins, Peyton Manning, Von Miller, Brian Robison, Osi Umenyiora, Mike Vrabel. (Berens, Barbara)
April 27, 2011 115 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Arizona Cardinals, Inc., Atlanta Falcons Football Club LLC, Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership, Buccaneers Limited Partnership, Buffalo Bills, Inc., Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., Cinncinnati Bengals, Inc., Cleveland Browns LLC, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., Denver Broncos Football Club, Detroit Lions, Inc., Football Northwest LLC, Green Bay Packers, Inc., Houston NFL Holdings LP, Indianapolis Colts, Inc., Jacksonville Jaguars Ltd., Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc., Miami Dolphins, Ltd., Minnesota Vikings Football Club LLC, National Football League, New England Patriots, LP, New Orleans Louisiana Saints, LLC, New York Football Giants, Inc., New York Jets Football Club, Inc., Oakland Raiders LP, Panthers Football LLC, Philadelphia Eagles Football Club, Inc., Pittsburgh Steelers Sports, Inc., Rams Football Co, LLC, The, San Diego Chargers Football Co., San Francisco Forty Niners Ltd., Tennessee Football, Inc., Washington Football Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1). (Van Oort, Aaron)
April 27, 2011 114 REPLY Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Bond Request re 110 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Arizona Cardinals, Inc., Atlanta Falcons Football Club LLC, Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership, Buccaneers Limited Partnership, Buffalo Bills, Inc., Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., Cinncinnati Bengals, Inc., Cleveland Browns LLC, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., Denver Broncos Football Club, Detroit Lions, Inc., Football Northwest LLC, Green Bay Packers, Inc., Houston NFL Holdings LP, Indianapolis Colts, Inc., Jacksonville Jaguars Ltd., Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc., Miami Dolphins, Ltd., Minnesota Vikings Football Club LLC, National Football League, New England Patriots, LP, New Orleans Louisiana Saints, LLC, New York Football Giants, Inc., New York Jets Football Club, Inc., Oakland Raiders LP, Panthers Football LLC, Philadelphia Eagles Football Club, Inc., Pittsburgh Steelers Sports, Inc., Rams Football Co, LLC, The, San Diego Chargers Football Co., San Francisco Forty Niners Ltd., Tennessee Football, Inc., Washington Football Inc. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate). (Connolly, Daniel) Modified text on 4/28/2011 (lmb).
April 27, 2011 113 Featured Case ORDER re Letter to District Judge 112 : The Court will permit Defendants to file a reply limited solely to Plaintiffs' request for a bond should a stay be granted. Defendants' reply shall be no more than four pages in length and shall be filed no later that 4:00 p.m. today, April 27, 2011. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 04/27/2011. (jmf)
April 27, 2011 112 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE re Issue of a Stay Pending Appeal by Arizona Cardinals, Inc., Atlanta Falcons Football Club LLC, Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership, Buccaneers Limited Partnership, Buffalo Bills, Inc., Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., Cinncinnati Bengals, Inc., Cleveland Browns LLC, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., Denver Broncos Football Club, Detroit Lions, Inc., Football Northwest LLC, Green Bay Packers, Inc., Houston NFL Holdings LP, Indianapolis Colts, Inc., Jacksonville Jaguars Ltd., Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc., Miami Dolphins, Ltd., Minnesota Vikings Football Club LLC, National Football League, New England Patriots, LP, New Orleans Louisiana Saints, LLC, New York Football Giants, Inc., New York Jets Football Club, Inc., Oakland Raiders LP, Panthers Football LLC, Philadelphia Eagles Football Club, Inc., Pittsburgh Steelers Sports, Inc., Rams Football Co, LLC, The, San Diego Chargers Football Co., San Francisco Forty Niners Ltd., Tennessee Football, Inc., Washington Football Inc. (Van Oort, Aaron) Modified text on 4/27/2011 (lmb).
April 27, 2011 111 DECLARATION of Richard A. Berthelsen in Support of 110 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Tom Brady, Drew Brees, Vincent Jackson, Ben Leber, Logan Mankins, Peyton Manning, Von Miller, Brian Robison, Osi Umenyiora, Mike Vrabel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A-F). (Berens, Barbara) Modified text on 4/27/2011 (lmb).
April 27, 2011 110 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 101 MOTION to Stay (Expedited) Pending Appeal, Brady Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for A Stay Pending Appeal filed by Tom Brady, Drew Brees, Vincent Jackson, Ben Leber, Logan Mankins, Peyton Manning, Von Miller, Brian Robison, Osi Umenyiora, Mike Vrabel. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate). (Berens, Barbara) Modified text on 4/27/2011 (lmb).
April 26, 2011 118 USCA Case Number 11-1898 for 100 Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit, filed by Rams Football Co, LLC, The, Buffalo Bills, Inc., Denver Broncos Football Club, National Football League, Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership, San Diego Chargers Football Co., Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., Detroit Lions, Inc., Oakland Raiders LP, Arizona Cardinals, Inc., Minnesota Vikings Football Club LLC, Jacksonville Jaguars Ltd., San Francisco Forty Niners Ltd., Atlanta Falcons Football Club LLC, Tennessee Football, Inc., Panthers Football LLC, Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc., Cinncinnati Bengals, Inc., Philadelphia Eagles Football Club, Inc., Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., Green Bay Packers, Inc., Buccaneers Limited Partnership, New York Football Giants, Inc., Miami Dolphins, Ltd., Washington Football Inc., New England Patriots, LP, New York Jets Football Club, Inc., Football Northwest LLC, New Orleans Louisiana Saints, LLC, Indianapolis Colts, Inc., Cleveland Browns LLC, Pittsburgh Steelers Sports, Inc., Houston NFL Holdings LP. (jam)
April 26, 2011 109 RECEIPT number 44641053978 in the amount of $455.00 issued to Faegre Benson. (MMP) (Qc'd by akl on 5/3/11)
April 26, 2011 108 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE Requesting Clarification of Memorandum and Order 99 , by Tom Brady, Drew Brees, Vincent Jackson, Ben Leber, Logan Mankins, Peyton Manning, Von Miller, Brian Robison, Osi Umenyiora, Mike Vrabel. (Berens, Barbara) Modified text and link on 4/26/2011 (lmb).
April 26, 2011 107 Featured Case ORDER: The Court directs Plaintiffs to file their request for clarification of this Court's order on ECF in accordance with Local Rule 7.1(h). Counsel for Defendants may respond by 5:00 p.m. on April 27, 2011. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 4/26/2011. (jmf)
April 26, 2011 106 TRANSMITTAL OF APPEAL LETTER TO U. S. COURT OF APPEALS, 8TH CIRCUIT, Re: Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit 100 . (kt)
April 26, 2011 105 JUDGMENT (Attachments: # 1 Civil-8th Circuit Pre-Hearing Conference Notice, # 2 Civil Notice - appeal)(kt)
April 26, 2011 104 Featured Case ORDER setting briefing schedule for Defendants' Motion to Stay 101 . Counsel for Plaintiffs shall file a response to Defendants' motion by 9:00 a.m. on Wednesday, April 27, 2011, and shall provide two courtesy copies to Judge Nelson's Chambers. This matter will be considered upon the written submissions. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 04/26/2011. (jmf)
April 25, 2011 103 MEMORANDUM in Support re 101 MOTION to Stay (Expedited) Pending Appeal filed by Arizona Cardinals, Inc., Atlanta Falcons Football Club LLC, Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership, Buccaneers Limited Partnership, Buffalo Bills, Inc., Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., Cinncinnati Bengals, Inc., Cleveland Browns LLC, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., Denver Broncos Football Club, Detroit Lions, Inc., Football Northwest LLC, Green Bay Packers, Inc., Houston NFL Holdings LP, Indianapolis Colts, Inc., Jacksonville Jaguars Ltd., Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc., Miami Dolphins, Ltd., Minnesota Vikings Football Club LLC, National Football League, New England Patriots, LP, New Orleans Louisiana Saints, LLC, New York Football Giants, Inc., New York Jets Football Club, Inc., Oakland Raiders LP, Panthers Football LLC, Philadelphia Eagles Football Club, Inc., Pittsburgh Steelers Sports, Inc., Rams Football Co, LLC, The, San Diego Chargers Football Co., San Francisco Forty Niners Ltd., Tennessee Football, Inc., Washington Football Inc. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate). (Connolly, Daniel) Modified text on 4/26/2011 (lmb).
April 25, 2011 102 NOTICE by Arizona Cardinals, Inc., Atlanta Falcons Football Club LLC, Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership, Buccaneers Limited Partnership, Buffalo Bills, Inc., Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., Cinncinnati Bengals, Inc., Cleveland Browns LLC, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., Denver Broncos Football Club, Detroit Lions, Inc., Football Northwest LLC, Green Bay Packers, Inc., Houston NFL Holdings LP, Indianapolis Colts, Inc., Jacksonville Jaguars Ltd., Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc., Miami Dolphins, Ltd., Minnesota Vikings Football Club LLC, National Football League, New England Patriots, LP, New Orleans Louisiana Saints, LLC, New York Football Giants, Inc., New York Jets Football Club, Inc., Oakland Raiders LP, Panthers Football LLC, Philadelphia Eagles Football Club, Inc., Pittsburgh Steelers Sports, Inc., Rams Football Co, LLC, The, San Diego Chargers Football Co., San Francisco Forty Niners Ltd., Tennessee Football, Inc., Washington Football Inc. re 101 MOTION to Stay (Expedited) Pending Appeal. (Connolly, Daniel) Modified text on 4/26/2011 (lmb).
April 25, 2011 101 MOTION to Stay (Expedited) Pending Appeal by Arizona Cardinals, Inc., Atlanta Falcons Football Club LLC, Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership, Buccaneers Limited Partnership, Buffalo Bills, Inc., Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., Cinncinnati Bengals, Inc., Cleveland Browns LLC, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., Denver Broncos Football Club, Detroit Lions, Inc., Football Northwest LLC, Green Bay Packers, Inc., Houston NFL Holdings LP, Indianapolis Colts, Inc., Jacksonville Jaguars Ltd., Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc., Miami Dolphins, Ltd., Minnesota Vikings Football Club LLC, National Football League, New England Patriots, LP, New Orleans Louisiana Saints, LLC, New York Football Giants, Inc., New York Jets Football Club, Inc., Oakland Raiders LP, Panthers Football LLC, Philadelphia Eagles Football Club, Inc., Pittsburgh Steelers Sports, Inc., Rams Football Co, LLC, The, San Diego Chargers Football Co., San Francisco Forty Niners Ltd., Tennessee Football, Inc., Washington Football Inc. (Connolly, Daniel)
April 25, 2011 100 NOTICE OF APPEAL TO 8TH CIRCUIT by Arizona Cardinals, Inc., Atlanta Falcons Football Club LLC, Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership, Buccaneers Limited Partnership, Buffalo Bills, Inc., Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., Cinncinnati Bengals, Inc., Cleveland Browns LLC, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., Denver Broncos Football Club, Detroit Lions, Inc., Football Northwest LLC, Green Bay Packers, Inc., Houston NFL Holdings LP, Indianapolis Colts, Inc., Jacksonville Jaguars Ltd., Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc., Miami Dolphins, Ltd., Minnesota Vikings Football Club LLC, National Football League, New England Patriots, LP, New Orleans Louisiana Saints, LLC, New York Football Giants, Inc., New York Jets Football Club, Inc., Oakland Raiders LP, Panthers Football LLC, Philadelphia Eagles Football Club, Inc., Pittsburgh Steelers Sports, Inc., Rams Football Co, LLC, The, San Diego Chargers Football Co., San Francisco Forty Niners Ltd., Tennessee Football, Inc., Washington Football Inc. (Attachments: # 1 COA - Form A). (Connolly, Daniel)
April 25, 2011 99 Featured Case ORDER granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction 2 ; Finding as moot Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction 58 . (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 04/25/2011. (jmf)
April 25, 2011 98 Featured Case ORDER re 97 Stipulation, filed by all parties. Arizona Cardinals, Inc. answer due 5/23/2011; Atlanta Falcons Football Club LLC answer due 5/23/2011; Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership answer due 5/23/2011; Buccaneers Limited Partnership answer due 5/23/2011; Buffalo Bills, Inc. answer due 5/23/2011; Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc. answer due 5/23/2011; Cinncinnati Bengals, Inc. answer due 5/23/2011; Cleveland Browns LLC answer due 5/23/2011; Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd. answer due 5/23/2011; Denver Broncos Football Club answer due 5/23/2011; Detroit Lions, Inc. answer due 5/23/2011; Football Northwest LLC answer due 5/23/2011; Green Bay Packers, Inc. answer due 5/23/2011; Houston NFL Holdings LP answer due 5/23/2011; Indianapolis Colts, Inc. answer due 5/23/2011; Jacksonville Jaguars Ltd. answer due 5/23/2011; Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc. answer due 5/23/2011; Miami Dolphins, Ltd. answer due 5/23/2011; Minnesota Vikings Football Club LLC answer due 5/23/2011; National Football League answer due 5/23/2011; New England Patriots, LP answer due 5/23/2011; New Orleans Louisiana Saints, LLC answer due 5/23/2011; New York Football Giants, Inc. answer due 5/23/2011; New York Jets Football Club, Inc. answer due 5/23/2011; Oakland Raiders LP answer due 5/23/2011; Panthers Football LLC answer due 5/23/2011; Philadelphia Eagles Football Club, Inc. answer due 5/23/2011; Pittsburgh Steelers Sports, Inc. answer due 5/23/2011; Rams Football Co, LLC, The answer due 5/23/2011; San Diego Chargers Football Co. answer due 5/23/2011; San Francisco Forty Niners Ltd. answer due 5/23/2011; Tennessee Football, Inc. answer due 5/23/2011; Washington Football Inc. answer due 5/23/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 4/22/11. (RLR)
April 22, 2011 97 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD by Arizona Cardinals, Inc., Atlanta Falcons Football Club LLC, Obafemi Ayanbadejo, Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership, Tom Brady, Drew Brees, Buccaneers Limited Partnership, Buffalo Bills, Inc., Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., Cinncinnati Bengals, Inc., Cleveland Browns LLC, Ryan Collins, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., Denver Broncos Football Club, Detroit Lions, Inc., Carl Eller, Football Northwest LLC, Green Bay Packers, Inc., Priest Holmes, Houston NFL Holdings LP, Indianapolis Colts, Inc., Vincent Jackson, Jacksonville Jaguars Ltd., Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc., Ben Leber, Logan Mankins, Peyton Manning, Miami Dolphins, Ltd., Von Miller, Minnesota Vikings Football Club LLC, National Football League, New England Patriots, LP, New Orleans Louisiana Saints, LLC, New York Football Giants, Inc., New York Jets Football Club, Inc., Oakland Raiders LP, Panthers Football LLC, Philadelphia Eagles Football Club, Inc., Pittsburgh Steelers Sports, Inc., Rams Football Co, LLC, The, Brian Robison, San Diego Chargers Football Co., San Francisco Forty Niners Ltd., Tennessee Football, Inc., Osi Umenyiora, Mike Vrabel, Antawan Walker, Washington Football Inc.. (Connolly, Daniel)
April 20, 2011 96 Featured Case ORDER: The Court has recessed the current mediation session. The parties shall return for continued mediation on May 16, 2011, at 10:00 a.m. in Chambers 9E of the United States Courthouse, 300 South Fourth Street, Minneapolis, Minnesota. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 04/20/2011. (lmb)
April 20, 2011 95 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan: CONFERENCE held on 4/20/2011. (lmb)
April 19, 2011 94 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan: CONFERENCE held on 4/19/2011. (lmb)
April 15, 2011 93 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan: CONFERENCE held on 4/15/2011. (lmb)
April 14, 2011 92 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan: CONFERENCE held on 4/14/2011. (lmb)
April 14, 2011 91 EXHIBIT re 7 Affidavit in Support of Motion, by Tom Brady, Drew Brees, Vincent Jackson, Ben Leber, Logan Mankins, Peyton Manning, Von Miller, Brian Robison, Osi Umenyiora, Mike Vrabel. (Berens, Barbara)
April 14, 2011 90 Featured Case ORDER: Plaintiffs request to supplement the record is granted. Counsel is directed to supplement the record by filing the exhibits on ECF. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 4/14/2011. (jmf)
April 13, 2011 88 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan: CONFERENCE held on 4/13/2011. (lmb)
April 12, 2011 89 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan: CONFERENCE held on 4/12/2011. (lmb) Modified text on 4/13/2011 (lmb).
April 12, 2011 87 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE regarding conference call (originally filed in 11-cv-748 SRN/JJG on 4/7/11) by Arizona Cardinals, Inc., Atlanta Falcons Football Club LLC, Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership, Buccaneers Limited Partnership, Buffalo Bills, Inc., Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., Cinncinnati Bengals, Inc., Cleveland Browns LLC, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., Denver Broncos Football Club, Detroit Lions, Inc., Football Northwest LLC, Green Bay Packers, Inc., Houston NFL Holdings LP, Indianapolis Colts, Inc., Jacksonville Jaguars Ltd., Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc., Miami Dolphins, Ltd., Minnesota Vikings Football Club LLC, National Football League, New England Patriots, LP, New Orleans Louisiana Saints, LLC, New York Football Giants, Inc., New York Jets Football Club, Inc., Oakland Raiders LP, Panthers Football LLC, Philadelphia Eagles Football Club, Inc., Pittsburgh Steelers Sports, Inc., Rams Football Co, LLC, The, San Diego Chargers Football Co., San Francisco Forty Niners Ltd., Tennessee Football, Inc., Washington Football Inc. (akl)
April 12, 2011 86 Minute Entry (originally filed in 11-cv-748 SRN/JJG on 4/7/11): Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and the Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate Cases held on 4/6/2011 before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. Motions were submitted, argued and taken under advisement. (Court Reporter Lorilee Fink) (akl)
April 12, 2011 85 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE (originally filed in 11-cv-748 SRN/JJG on 4/7/11) by Obafemi Ayanbadejo, Ryan Collins, Carl Eller, Priest Holmes, Antawan Walker. (akl)
April 12, 2011 84 Supplemental AFFIDAVIT of Mark J. Feinberg in SUPPORT OF 58 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (originally filed in 11-748 SRN/JJG on 4/7/11) filed by Obafemi Ayanbadejo, Ryan Collins, Carl Eller, Priest Holmes, Antawan Walker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Certificate of Service)(akl)
April 12, 2011 83 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (originally filed in 11-cv-748 SRN/JJG on 4/5/11) by Obafemi Ayanbadejo, Ryan Collins, Carl Eller, Priest Holmes, Antawan Walker re 82 Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion (akl)
April 12, 2011 82 REPLY MEMORANDUM in Support (originally filed in 11-748 SRN/JJG on 4/4/11) re 58 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Obafemi Ayanbadejo, Ryan Collins, Carl Eller, Priest Holmes, Antawan Walker. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(akl)
April 12, 2011 81 Featured Case ORDER (originally filed in 11-cv-748 SRN/JJG on 4/4/11) granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Expedite the Briefing Schedule and Hearing. See Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 04/04/11. (akl)
April 12, 2011 80 Featured Case ORDER ON STIPULATION FOR ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE FOR ALL DEFENDANTS AND EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT (originally filed in 11-cv-748 SRN/JJG on 4/4/11): Pursuant to the Stipulation for Acceptance of Service for All Defendants and Extension of Time to Respond to the Amended Complaint (Doc. No. 33), entered into by the parties, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the time within which each and every Defendant in this matter shall have to move against, answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint is extended up to and including June 1, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 04/04/2011. (akl)
April 12, 2011 79 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (originally filed in 11-cv-748 SRN/JJG on 4/4/11) by Arizona Cardinals, Inc., Atlanta Falcons Football Club LLC, Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership, Buccaneers Limited Partnership, Buffalo Bills, Inc., Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., Cinncinnati Bengals, Inc., Cleveland Browns LLC, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., Denver Broncos Football Club, Detroit Lions, Inc., Football Northwest LLC, Green Bay Packers, Inc., Houston NFL Holdings LP, Indianapolis Colts, Inc., Jacksonville Jaguars Ltd., Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc., Miami Dolphins, Ltd., Minnesota Vikings Football Club LLC, National Football League, New England Patriots, LP, New Orleans Louisiana Saints, LLC, New York Football Giants, Inc., New York Jets Football Club, Inc., Oakland Raiders LP, Panthers Football LLC, Philadelphia Eagles Football Club, Inc., Pittsburgh Steelers Sports, Inc., Rams Football Co, LLC, The, San Diego Chargers Football Co., San Francisco Forty Niners Ltd., Tennessee Football, Inc., Washington Football Inc. re 78 Response, 76 Declaration in Opposition, 75 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 77 Response. (akl)
April 12, 2011 78 RESPONSE (originally filed in 11-cv-748 SRN/JJG on 4/4/11) re 67 MOTION to Expedite filed by Arizona Cardinals, Inc., Atlanta Falcons Football Club LLC, Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership, Buccaneers Limited Partnership, Buffalo Bills, Inc., Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., Cinncinnati Bengals, Inc., Cleveland Browns LLC, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., Denver Broncos Football Club, Detroit Lions, Inc., Football Northwest LLC, Green Bay Packers, Inc., Houston NFL Holdings LP, Indianapolis Colts, Inc., Jacksonville Jaguars Ltd., Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc., Miami Dolphins, Ltd., Minnesota Vikings Football Club LLC, National Football League, New England Patriots, LP, New Orleans Louisiana Saints, LLC, New York Football Giants, Inc., New York Jets Football Club, Inc., Oakland Raiders LP, Panthers Football LLC, Philadelphia Eagles Football Club, Inc., Pittsburgh Steelers Sports, Inc., Rams Football Co, LLC, The, San Diego Chargers Football Co., San Francisco Forty Niners Ltd., Tennessee Football, Inc., Washington Football Inc. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(akl)
April 12, 2011 77 RESPONSE (originally filed in 11-cv-748 SRN/JJG on 4/4/11) re 63 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Arizona Cardinals, Inc., Atlanta Falcons Football Club LLC, Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership, Buccaneers Limited Partnership, Buffalo Bills, Inc., Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., Cinncinnati Bengals, Inc., Cleveland Browns LLC, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., Denver Broncos Football Club, Detroit Lions, Inc., Football Northwest LLC, Green Bay Packers, Inc., Houston NFL Holdings LP, Indianapolis Colts, Inc., Jacksonville Jaguars Ltd., Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc., Miami Dolphins, Ltd., Minnesota Vikings Football Club LLC, National Football League, New England Patriots, LP, New Orleans Louisiana Saints, LLC, New York Football Giants, Inc., New York Jets Football Club, Inc., Oakland Raiders LP, Panthers Football LLC, Philadelphia Eagles Football Club, Inc., Pittsburgh Steelers Sports, Inc., Rams Football Co, LLC, The, San Diego Chargers Football Co., San Francisco Forty Niners Ltd., Tennessee Football, Inc., Washington Football Inc. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(akl)
April 12, 2011 76 DECLARATION of Daniel J. Connolly in Opposition (originally filed in 11-748 SRN/JJG on 4/4/11) to 58 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Arizona Cardinals, Inc., Atlanta Falcons Football Club LLC, Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership, Buccaneers Limited Partnership, Buffalo Bills, Inc., Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., Cinncinnati Bengals, Inc., Cleveland Browns LLC, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., Denver Broncos Football Club, Detroit Lions, Inc., Football Northwest LLC, Green Bay Packers, Inc., Houston NFL Holdings LP, Indianapolis Colts, Inc., Jacksonville Jaguars Ltd., Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc., Miami Dolphins, Ltd., Minnesota Vikings Football Club LLC, National Football League, New England Patriots, LP, New Orleans Louisiana Saints, LLC, New York Football Giants, Inc., New York Jets Football Club, Inc., Oakland Raiders LP, Panthers Football LLC, Philadelphia Eagles Football Club, Inc., Pittsburgh Steelers Sports, Inc., Rams Football Co, LLC, The, San Diego Chargers Football Co., San Francisco Forty Niners Ltd., Tennessee Football, Inc., Washington Football Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(akl)
April 12, 2011 75 MEMORANDUM in Opposition (originally filed in 11-748 SRN/JJG on 4/4/11) re 58 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Arizona Cardinals, Inc., Atlanta Falcons Football Club LLC, Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership, Buccaneers Limited Partnership, Buffalo Bills, Inc., Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., Cinncinnati Bengals, Inc., Cleveland Browns LLC, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., Denver Broncos Football Club, Detroit Lions, Inc., Football Northwest LLC, Green Bay Packers, Inc., Houston NFL Holdings LP, Indianapolis Colts, Inc., Jacksonville Jaguars Ltd., Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc., Miami Dolphins, Ltd., Minnesota Vikings Football Club LLC, National Football League, New England Patriots, LP, New Orleans Louisiana Saints, LLC, New York Football Giants, Inc., New York Jets Football Club, Inc., Oakland Raiders LP, Panthers Football LLC, Philadelphia Eagles Football Club, Inc., Pittsburgh Steelers Sports, Inc., Rams Football Co, LLC, The, San Diego Chargers Football Co., San Francisco Forty Niners Ltd., Tennessee Football, Inc., Washington Football Inc. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(akl)
April 12, 2011 74 STIPULATION for Acceptance of Service for all Defendants and Extension of Time to Respond to the Amended Complaint (originally filed in 11-cv-748 SRN/JJG on 4/1/11) by Arizona Cardinals, Inc., Atlanta Falcons Football Club LLC, Obafemi Ayanbadejo, Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership, Buccaneers Limited Partnership, Buffalo Bills, Inc., Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., Cinncinnati Bengals, Inc., Cleveland Browns LLC, Ryan Collins, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., Denver Broncos Football Club, Detroit Lions, Inc., Carl Eller, Football Northwest LLC, Green Bay Packers, Inc., Priest Holmes, Houston NFL Holdings LP, Indianapolis Colts, Inc., Jacksonville Jaguars Ltd., Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc., Miami Dolphins, Ltd., Minnesota Vikings Football Club LLC, National Football League, New England Patriots, LP, New Orleans Louisiana Saints, LLC, New York Football Giants, Inc., New York Jets Football Club, Inc., Oakland Raiders LP, Panthers Football LLC, Philadelphia Eagles Football Club, Inc., Pittsburgh Steelers Sports, Inc., Rams Football Co, LLC, The, San Diego Chargers Football Co., San Francisco Forty Niners Ltd., Tennessee Football, Inc., Antawan Walker, Washington Football Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(akl)
April 12, 2011 73 AMENDED COMPLAINT (originally filed in 11-cv-748 SRN/JJG on 4/1/11) against Arizona Cardinals, Inc., Atlanta Falcons Football Club LLC, Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership, Buccaneers Limited Partnership, Buffalo Bills, Inc., Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., Cinncinnati Bengals, Inc., Cleveland Browns LLC, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., Denver Broncos Football Club, Detroit Lions, Inc., Football Northwest LLC, Green Bay Packers, Inc., Houston NFL Holdings LP, Indianapolis Colts, Inc., Jacksonville Jaguars Ltd., Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc., Miami Dolphins, Ltd., Minnesota Vikings Football Club LLC, National Football League, New England Patriots, LP, New Orleans Louisiana Saints, LLC, New York Football Giants, Inc., New York Jets Football Club, Inc., Oakland Raiders LP, Panthers Football LLC, Philadelphia Eagles Football Club, Inc., Pittsburgh Steelers Sports, Inc., Rams Football Co, LLC, The, San Diego Chargers Football Co., San Francisco Forty Niners Ltd., Tennessee Football, Inc., Washington Football Inc., filed by Priest Holmes, Ryan Collins, Carl Eller, Obafemi Ayanbadejo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Index, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Certificate of Service) (akl)
April 12, 2011 72 STIPULATION for Acceptance of Service for all Defendants and Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint (originally filed in 11-cv-748 SRN/JJG on 03/31/11) by Arizona Cardinals, Inc., Atlanta Falcons Football Club LLC, Obafemi Ayanbadejo, Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership, Buccaneers Limited Partnership, Buffalo Bills, Inc., Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., Cinncinnati Bengals, Inc., Cleveland Browns LLC, Ryan Collins, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., Denver Broncos Football Club, Detroit Lions, Inc., Carl Eller, Football Northwest LLC, Green Bay Packers, Inc., Priest Holmes, Houston NFL Holdings LP, Indianapolis Colts, Inc., Jacksonville Jaguars Ltd., Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc., Miami Dolphins, Ltd., Von Miller, Minnesota Vikings Football Club LLC, National Football League, New England Patriots, LP, New Orleans Louisiana Saints, LLC, New York Football Giants, Inc., New York Jets Football Club, Inc., Oakland Raiders LP, Panthers Football LLC, Philadelphia Eagles Football Club, Inc., Pittsburgh Steelers Sports, Inc., Rams Football Co, LLC, The, San Diego Chargers Football Co., San Francisco Forty Niners Ltd., Tennessee Football, Inc., Washington Football Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(akl)
April 12, 2011 71 Featured Case ORDER (originally filed in 11-cv-748 SRN/JJG on 03/30/11): IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Counsel for Defendants shall file a response to Plaintiffs' motions [Doc Nos. 10, 15, 19] by noon on Monday, April 4, 2011, and shall provide two courtesy copies toJudge Nelson's Chambers. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 03/30/2011.(akl)
April 12, 2011 70 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (originally filed in 11-cv-748 SRN/JJG on 03/30/11) by Obafemi Ayanbadejo, Ryan Collins, Carl Eller, Priest Holmes re 67 MOTION to Expedite, 69 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 68 Notice of Hearing on Motion. (akl)
April 12, 2011 69 MEMORANDUM in Support re 67 MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule and Hearing (originally filed in 11-cv-748 SRN/JJG on 03/30/11) filed by Obafemi Ayanbadejo, Ryan Collins, Carl Eller, Priest Holmes. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(akl)
April 12, 2011 68 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 67 MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule and Hearing (originally filed in 11-cv-748 SRN/JJG on 03/30/11): Date and Time to be Determined. (akl)
April 12, 2011 67 MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule and Hearing (originally filed in 11-cv-748 SRN/JJG on 03/30/11) by Obafemi Ayanbadejo, Ryan Collins, Carl Eller, Priest Holmes. (akl)
April 12, 2011 66 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (originally filed in 11-cv-748 SRN/JJG on 03/30/11) by Obafemi Ayanbadejo, Ryan Collins, Carl Eller, Priest Holmes re 65 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 63 MOTION to Consolidate Cases, 64 Notice of Hearing on Motion. (akl)
April 12, 2011 65 MEMORANDUM in Support re 63 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (originally filed in 11-cv-748 SRN/JJG on 03/30/11) filed by Obafemi Ayanbadejo, Ryan Collins, Carl Eller, Priest Holmes. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(akl)
April 12, 2011 64 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 63 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (originally filed in 11-cv-748 SRN/JJG on 03/30/11): Date and Time to be Determined. (akl)
April 12, 2011 63 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (originally filed in 11-cv-748 SRN/JJG on 03/30/11) by Obafemi Ayanbadejo, Ryan Collins, Carl Eller, Priest Holmes. (akl)
April 12, 2011 62 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (originally filed in 11-cv-748 SRN/JJG on 03/30/11) by Obafemi Ayanbadejo, Ryan Collins, Carl Eller, Priest Holmes re 59 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 60 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 58 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, 61 Affidavit in Support of Motion. (akl)
April 12, 2011 61 AFFIDAVIT of Mark J. Feinberg in SUPPORT OF 58 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (originally filed in 11-748 SRN/JJG on 3/30/11) filed by Obafemi Ayanbadejo, Ryan Collins, Carl Eller, Priest Holmes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q)(akl)
April 12, 2011 60 MEMORANDUM in Support re 58 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (originally filed in 11-748 SRN/JJG on 3/30/11) filed by Obafemi Ayanbadejo, Ryan Collins, Carl Eller, Priest Holmes. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(akl)
April 12, 2011 59 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 58 Motion for Preliminary Injunction (originally filed in 11/748 SRN/JJG on 3/30/11): Date and Time of Hearing to be Determined by the Court. (akl)
April 12, 2011 58 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (originally filed in 11-748 SRN/JJG on 3/30/11) by Obafemi Ayanbadejo, Ryan Collins, Carl Eller, Priest Holmes. (akl)
April 12, 2011 57 COMPLAINT (originally filed in 11-cv-748 SRN/JJG on 3/28/11) against Arizona Cardinals, Inc., Atlanta Falcons Football Club LLC, Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership, Buccaneers Limited Partnership, Buffalo Bills, Inc., Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., Cinncinnati Bengals, Inc., Cleveland Browns LLC, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., Denver Broncos Football Club, Detroit Lions, Inc., Football Northwest LLC, Green Bay Packers, Inc., Houston NFL Holdings LP, Indianapolis Colts, Inc., Jacksonville Jaguars Ltd., Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc., Miami Dolphins, Ltd., Minnesota Vikings Football Club LLC, National Football League, New England Patriots, LP, New Orleans Louisiana Saints, LLC, New York Football Giants, Inc., New York Jets Football Club, Inc., Oakland Raiders LP, Panthers Football LLC, Philadelphia Eagles Football Club, Inc., Pittsburgh Steelers Sports, Inc., Rams Football Co, LLC, The, San Diego Chargers Football Co., San Francisco Forty Niners Ltd., Tennessee Football, Inc., Washington Football Inc., filed by Priest Holmes, Ryan Collins, Carl Eller, Obafemi Ayanbadejo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Civil Cover Sheet) (akl)
April 11, 2011 Featured Case TEXT ONLY ENTRY - ORDER granting 54 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney Robert M. Cooper for defendants. Fee paid; receipt number 3-008248. Approved by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 4/11/11. (MMC)
April 11, 2011 56 Featured Case ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 651(b) and Local Rule 16.5, the Court hereby orders the parties and attorneys to participate in mediation, the terms of which are set forth in the Order. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 04/11/2011. (jmf)
April 11, 2011 55 Featured Case ORDER FOR CONSOLIDATION granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate Cases 15 in 11-CV-748 SRN/JJG. Case numbers 11-CV-639 SRN/JJG and 11-CV-748 SRN/JJG shall hereby be consolidated under case number 11-CV-639 SRN/JJG and 11-CV-748 SRN/JJG shall be dismissed. Any documents filed in 11-CV-748 SRN/JJG shall be copied and docketed in case number 11-CV-639 SRN/JJG. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 04/11/11. (bcr) Modified text on 4/11/2011 (lmb).
April 8, 2011 Featured Case TEXT ONLY ENTRY - ORDER granting 53 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney DeMaurice F. Smith for plaintiffs. Fee paid; receipt number 4-053571. Approved by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 4/8/11. (MMC)
April 8, 2011 54 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Robert M. Cooper by Arizona Cardinals, Inc., Atlanta Falcons Football Club LLC, Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership, Buccaneers Limited Partnership, Buffalo Bills, Inc., Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., Cinncinnati Bengals, Inc., Cleveland Browns LLC, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., Denver Broncos Football Club, Detroit Lions, Inc., Football Northwest LLC, Green Bay Packers, Inc., Houston NFL Holdings LP, Indianapolis Colts, Inc., Jacksonville Jaguars Ltd., Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc., Miami Dolphins, Ltd., Minnesota Vikings Football Club LLC, National Football League, New England Patriots, LP, New Orleans Louisiana Saints, LLC, New York Football Giants, Inc., New York Jets Football Club, Inc., Oakland Raiders LP, Panthers Football LLC, Philadelphia Eagles Football Club, Inc., Pittsburgh Steelers Sports, Inc., Rams Football Co, LLC, The, San Diego Chargers Football Co., San Francisco Forty Niners Ltd., Tennessee Football, Inc., Washington Football Inc. (Connolly, Daniel)
April 8, 2011 53 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for DeMaurice F. Smith by Tom Brady, Drew Brees, Vincent Jackson, Ben Leber, Logan Mankins, Peyton Manning, Von Miller, Brian Robison, Osi Umenyiora, Mike Vrabel. (Berens, Barbara)
April 7, 2011 52 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE regarding conference call by Arizona Cardinals, Inc., Atlanta Falcons Football Club LLC, Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership, Buccaneers Limited Partnership, Buffalo Bills, Inc., Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., Cinncinnati Bengals, Inc., Cleveland Browns LLC, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., Denver Broncos Football Club, Detroit Lions, Inc., Football Northwest LLC, Green Bay Packers, Inc., Houston NFL Holdings LP, Indianapolis Colts, Inc., Jacksonville Jaguars Ltd., Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc., Miami Dolphins, Ltd., Minnesota Vikings Football Club LLC, National Football League, New England Patriots, LP, New Orleans Louisiana Saints, LLC, New York Football Giants, Inc., New York Jets Football Club, Inc., Oakland Raiders LP, Panthers Football LLC, Philadelphia Eagles Football Club, Inc., Pittsburgh Steelers Sports, Inc., Rams Football Co, LLC, The, San Diego Chargers Football Co., San Francisco Forty Niners Ltd., Tennessee Football, Inc., Washington Football Inc. (Connolly, Daniel) Modified text on 4/8/2011 (lmb).
April 7, 2011 51 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE, with Copy of Letter from Barbara P. Berens to Judge Nelson, by Tom Brady, Drew Brees, Vincent Jackson, Ben Leber, Logan Mankins, Peyton Manning, Von Miller, Brian Robison, Osi Umenyiora, Mike Vrabel. (Miller, Justi) Modified text on 4/8/2011 (lmb).
April 7, 2011 50 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Arizona Cardinals, Inc., Atlanta Falcons Football Club LLC, Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership, Buccaneers Limited Partnership, Buffalo Bills, Inc., Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., Cinncinnati Bengals, Inc., Cleveland Browns LLC, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., Denver Broncos Football Club, Detroit Lions, Inc., Football Northwest LLC, Green Bay Packers, Inc., Houston NFL Holdings LP, Indianapolis Colts, Inc., Jacksonville Jaguars Ltd., Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc., Miami Dolphins, Ltd., Minnesota Vikings Football Club LLC, National Football League, New England Patriots, LP, New Orleans Louisiana Saints, LLC, New York Football Giants, Inc., New York Jets Football Club, Inc., Oakland Raiders LP, Panthers Football LLC, Philadelphia Eagles Football Club, Inc., Pittsburgh Steelers Sports, Inc., Rams Football Co, LLC, The, San Diego Chargers Football Co., San Francisco Forty Niners Ltd., Tennessee Football, Inc., Washington Football Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit: Copy of Letter). (Connolly, Daniel) Modified text on 4/8/2011 (lmb).
April 7, 2011 49 Featured Case ORDER of Reassignment of Related Cases that 11cv842 ADM/JJK has been reassigned to Judge Susan R. Nelson and Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham. Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 4/7/11 and Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 4/7/11. (JMH) (Modified on 4/7/11)(JMH)
April 7, 2011 48 Minute Entry for Hearing re: Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction 2 held on 4/6/2011 before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (Court Reporter Lorilee Fink) (jmf)
April 7, 2011 47 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE re Mediation/Settlement by Tom Brady, Drew Brees, Vincent Jackson, Ben Leber, Logan Mankins, Peyton Manning, Von Miller, Brian Robison, Osi Umenyiora, Mike Vrabel. (Berens, Barbara) Modified text on 4/7/2011 (lmb).
April 6, 2011 46 EXHIBIT re 4 Memorandum in Support of Motion, by Tom Brady, Drew Brees, Vincent Jackson, Ben Leber, Logan Mankins, Peyton Manning, Von Miller, Brian Robison, Osi Umenyiora, Mike Vrabel. (Berens, Barbara)
April 4, 2011 45 Featured Case ORDER granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Expedite the Briefing Schedule and Hearing [Doc. No 19 in related case 11-cv-748 SRN/JJG]. See order for additional details. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 04/04/2011. (jmf)
March 30, 2011 44 Featured Case ORDER FOR REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES that 11cv748 has been reassigned to Judge Susan R. Nelson and Magistrate Jduge Jeanne J. Graham. Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle and Judge Susan R. Nelson on 3/29/11. (JMH)
March 28, 2011 43 DECLARATION of Barbara P. Berens in Support of 41 Reply, filed by Tom Brady, Drew Brees, Vincent Jackson, Ben Leber, Logan Mankins, Peyton Manning, Von Miller, Brian Robison, Osi Umenyiora, Mike Vrabel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B). (Berens, Barbara) Modified text on 3/29/2011 (lmb).
March 28, 2011 42 Supplemental DECLARATION of Richard A. Berthelsen in Support of 41 Reply, filed by Tom Brady, Drew Brees, Vincent Jackson, Ben Leber, Logan Mankins, Peyton Manning, Von Miller, Brian Robison, Osi Umenyiora, Mike Vrabel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C, # 4 Exhibit(s) D). (Berens, Barbara) Modified text on 3/29/2011 (lmb).
March 28, 2011 41 REPLY re 4 Memorandum in Support of Motion, filed by Tom Brady, Drew Brees, Vincent Jackson, Ben Leber, Logan Mankins, Peyton Manning, Von Miller, Brian Robison, Osi Umenyiora, Mike Vrabel. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Berens, Barbara)
March 28, 2011 40 Featured Case ORDER re 38 Stipulation filed by Brian Robison, Rams Football Co, LLC, The, Peyton Manning, National Football League, Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership, San Diego Chargers Football Co., Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., Detroit Lions, Inc., Mike Vrabel, San Francisco Forty Niners Ltd., Panthers Football LLC, Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc., Cinncinnati Bengals, Inc., Logan Mankins, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., Miami Dolphins, Ltd., Drew Brees, Washington Football Inc., New York Jets Football Club, Inc., Houston NFL Holdings LP, Buffalo Bills, Inc., Tom Brady, Denver Broncos Football Club, Oakland Raiders LP, Arizona Cardinals, Inc., Vincent Jackson, Jacksonville Jaguars Ltd., Minnesota Vikings Football Club LLC, Atlanta Falcons Football Club LLC, Tennessee Football, Inc., Ben Leber, Philadelphia Eagles Football Club, Inc., Green Bay Packers, Inc., Buccaneers Limited Partnership, New York Football Giants, Inc., Osi Umenyiora, New England Patriots, LP, Von Miller, Football Northwest LLC, New Orleans Louisiana Saints, LLC, Indianapolis Colts, Inc., Cleveland Browns LLC, Pittsburgh Steelers Sports, Inc. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the time within which each and every Defendant in this matter shall have to move against, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended up to and including April 27, 2011. Arizona Cardinals, Inc. answer due 4/27/2011; Atlanta Falcons Football Club LLC answer due 4/27/2011; Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership answer due 4/27/2011; Buccaneers Limited Partnership answer due 4/27/2011; Buffalo Bills, Inc. answer due 4/27/2011; Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc. answer due 4/27/2011; Cinncinnati Bengals, Inc. answer due 4/27/2011; Cleveland Browns LLC answer due 4/27/2011; Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd. answer due 4/27/2011; Denver Broncos Football Club answer due 4/27/2011; Detroit Lions, Inc. answer due 4/27/2011; Football Northwest LLC answer due 4/27/2011; Green Bay Packers, Inc. answer due 4/27/2011; Houston NFL Holdings LP answer due 4/27/2011; Indianapolis Colts, Inc. answer due 4/27/2011; Jacksonville Jaguars Ltd. answer due 4/27/2011; Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc. answer due 4/27/2011; Miami Dolphins, Ltd. answer due 4/27/2011; Minnesota Vikings Football Club LLC answer due 4/27/2011; National Football League answer due 4/27/2011; New England Patriots, LP answer due 4/27/2011; New Orleans Louisiana Saints, LLC answer due 4/27/2011; New York Football Giants, Inc. answer due 4/27/2011; New York Jets Football Club, Inc. answer due 4/27/2011; Oakland Raiders LP answer due 4/27/2011; Panthers Football LLC answer due 4/27/2011; Philadelphia Eagles Football Club, Inc. answer due 4/27/2011; Pittsburgh Steelers Sports, Inc. answer due 4/27/2011; Rams Football Co, LLC, The answer due 4/27/2011; San Diego Chargers Football Co. answer due 4/27/2011; San Francisco Forty Niners Ltd. answer due 4/27/2011; Tennessee Football, Inc. answer due 4/27/2011; Washington Football Inc. answer due 4/27/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 03/28/2011. (lmb)
March 28, 2011 39 COPY of LETTER from CT Corporation to attorney Berens regarding registered agent for service on New York Jets party. (LPH)
March 25, 2011 38 STIPULATION re 1 Complaint, Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead by all defendants, all plaintiffs. (Miller, Justi) Modified text on 3/28/2011 (lmb).
March 21, 2011 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Arizona Cardinals, Inc., Atlanta Falcons Football Club LLC, Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership, Buccaneers Limited Partnership, Buffalo Bills, Inc., Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., Cinncinnati Bengals, Inc., Cleveland Browns LLC, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., Denver Broncos Football Club, Detroit Lions, Inc., Football Northwest LLC, Green Bay Packers, Inc., Houston NFL Holdings LP, Indianapolis Colts, Inc., Vincent Jackson, Jacksonville Jaguars Ltd., Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc., Miami Dolphins, Ltd., Minnesota Vikings Football Club LLC, National Football League, New England Patriots, LP, New Orleans Louisiana Saints, LLC, New York Football Giants, Inc., New York Jets Football Club, Inc., Oakland Raiders LP, Panthers Football LLC, Philadelphia Eagles Football Club, Inc., Pittsburgh Steelers Sports, Inc., Rams Football Co, LLC, The, San Diego Chargers Football Co., San Francisco Forty Niners Ltd., Tennessee Football, Inc., Washington Football Inc. re 36 Declaration in Support, 34 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 35 Declaration in Support. (Connolly, Daniel)
March 21, 2011 36 DECLARATION of Daniel J. Connolly in Support of 34 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Arizona Cardinals, Inc., Atlanta Falcons Football Club LLC, Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership, Buccaneers Limited Partnership, Buffalo Bills, Inc., Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., Cinncinnati Bengals, Inc., Cleveland Browns LLC, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., Denver Broncos Football Club, Detroit Lions, Inc., Football Northwest LLC, Green Bay Packers, Inc., Houston NFL Holdings LP, Indianapolis Colts, Inc., Jacksonville Jaguars Ltd., Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc., Miami Dolphins, Ltd., Minnesota Vikings Football Club LLC, National Football League, New England Patriots, LP, New Orleans Louisiana Saints, LLC, New York Football Giants, Inc., New York Jets Football Club, Inc., Oakland Raiders LP, Panthers Football LLC, Philadelphia Eagles Football Club, Inc., Pittsburgh Steelers Sports, Inc., Rams Football Co, LLC, The, San Diego Chargers Football Co., San Francisco Forty Niners Ltd., Tennessee Football, Inc., Washington Football Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A-P, # 2 Exhibit(s) Q, # 3 Exhibit(s) R, # 4 Exhibit(s) S, # 5 Exhibit(s) T, # 6 Exhibit(s) U). SEALED DOCUMENTS RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE ON 3/21/11. (Connolly, Daniel) Modified on 3/21/2011 (akl).
March 21, 2011 35 DECLARATION of Peter Ruocco in Support of 34 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Arizona Cardinals, Inc., Atlanta Falcons Football Club LLC, Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership, Buccaneers Limited Partnership, Buffalo Bills, Inc., Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., Cinncinnati Bengals, Inc., Cleveland Browns LLC, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., Denver Broncos Football Club, Detroit Lions, Inc., Football Northwest LLC, Green Bay Packers, Inc., Houston NFL Holdings LP, Indianapolis Colts, Inc., Jacksonville Jaguars Ltd., Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc., Miami Dolphins, Ltd., Minnesota Vikings Football Club LLC, National Football League, New England Patriots, LP, New Orleans Louisiana Saints, LLC, New York Football Giants, Inc., New York Jets Football Club, Inc., Oakland Raiders LP, Panthers Football LLC, Philadelphia Eagles Football Club, Inc., Pittsburgh Steelers Sports, Inc., Rams Football Co, LLC, The, San Diego Chargers Football Co., San Francisco Forty Niners Ltd., Tennessee Football, Inc., Washington Football Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Tab 1, # 2 Exhibit(s) Tab 2). (Connolly, Daniel)
March 21, 2011 34 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Arizona Cardinals, Inc., Atlanta Falcons Football Club LLC, Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership, Buccaneers Limited Partnership, Buffalo Bills, Inc., Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., Cinncinnati Bengals, Inc., Cleveland Browns LLC, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., Denver Broncos Football Club, Detroit Lions, Inc., Football Northwest LLC, Green Bay Packers, Inc., Houston NFL Holdings LP, Indianapolis Colts, Inc., Jacksonville Jaguars Ltd., Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc., Miami Dolphins, Ltd., Minnesota Vikings Football Club LLC, National Football League, New England Patriots, LP, New Orleans Louisiana Saints, LLC, New York Football Giants, Inc., New York Jets Football Club, Inc., Oakland Raiders LP, Panthers Football LLC, Philadelphia Eagles Football Club, Inc., Pittsburgh Steelers Sports, Inc., Rams Football Co, LLC, The, San Diego Chargers Football Co., San Francisco Forty Niners Ltd., Tennessee Football, Inc., Washington Football Inc. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate). (Connolly, Daniel)
March 14, 2011 Featured Case TEXT ONLY ENTRY - ORDER granting 24 , 25 , 26 , 27 , 28 , 29 , 30 , 31 Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorneys James W. Quinn,Bruce S. Meyer,Jennifer Stewart,Christopher R. Clark,Molly Donovan,David G. Feher,David L. Greenspan and Jeffrey L. Kessler for plaintiffs. Fees paid; receipt number 4-052997. Approved by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 3/14/11. (MMC)
March 14, 2011 Featured Case TEXT ONLY ENTRY - ORDER granting 17 , 18 , 22 , 23 , 32 Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorneys Gregg H. Levy,James M. Garland,David Boies,William A. Isaacson and Benjamin C. Block for National Football League. Fees paid; receipt number 3-008137.Approved by Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham on 3/14/11. (MMC)
March 14, 2011 33 Featured Case ORDER: 2 The Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Tom Brady, Drew Brees, Ben Leber, Logan Mankins, Peyton Manning, Von Miller, Brian Robison, Osi Umenyiora, Mike Vrabel, Vincent Jackson [Doc. 2] will be heard on April 6, 2011 at 9:30 a.m. before Judge Susan Richard Nelson, in Courtroom 7B, United States Courthouse, 316 North Robert Street, St. Paul, Minnesota. Defendants shall file a responsive brief on or before March 21, 2011 and the Plaintiffs will be permitted a reply brief to be filed on or before March 28, 2011. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 03/14/2011. (jmf)
March 14, 2011 32 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Benjamin C. Block by National Football League. (Connolly, Daniel)
March 14, 2011 31 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Jeffrey Kessler by Tom Brady, Drew Brees, Vincent Jackson, Ben Leber, Logan Mankins, Peyton Manning, Von Miller, Brian Robison, Osi Umenyiora, Mike Vrabel. (Berens, Barbara)
March 14, 2011 30 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for David Greenspan by Tom Brady, Drew Brees, Vincent Jackson, Ben Leber, Logan Mankins, Peyton Manning, Von Miller, Brian Robison, Osi Umenyiora, Mike Vrabel. (Berens, Barbara)
March 14, 2011 29 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for David Feher by Tom Brady, Drew Brees, Vincent Jackson, Ben Leber, Logan Mankins, Peyton Manning, Von Miller, Brian Robison, Osi Umenyiora, Mike Vrabel. (Berens, Barbara)
March 14, 2011 28 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Molly Donovan by Tom Brady, Drew Brees, Vincent Jackson, Ben Leber, Logan Mankins, Peyton Manning, Von Miller, Brian Robison, Osi Umenyiora, Mike Vrabel. (Berens, Barbara)
March 14, 2011 27 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Christopher R. Clark by Tom Brady, Drew Brees, Vincent Jackson, Ben Leber, Logan Mankins, Peyton Manning, Von Miller, Brian Robison, Osi Umenyiora, Mike Vrabel. (Berens, Barbara)
March 14, 2011 26 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Jennifer Stewart by Tom Brady, Drew Brees, Vincent Jackson, Ben Leber, Logan Mankins, Peyton Manning, Von Miller, Brian Robison, Osi Umenyiora, Mike Vrabel. (Berens, Barbara)
March 14, 2011 25 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Bruce S. Meyer by Tom Brady, Drew Brees, Vincent Jackson, Ben Leber, Logan Mankins, Peyton Manning, Von Miller, Brian Robison, Osi Umenyiora, Mike Vrabel. (Berens, Barbara)
March 14, 2011 24 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for James W. Quinn by Tom Brady, Drew Brees, Vincent Jackson, Ben Leber, Logan Mankins, Peyton Manning, Von Miller, Brian Robison, Osi Umenyiora, Mike Vrabel. (Berens, Barbara)
March 14, 2011 23 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for William A. Isaacson by National Football League. (Connolly, Daniel)
March 14, 2011 22 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for David Boies by National Football League. (Connolly, Daniel)
March 14, 2011 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J Connolly on behalf of National Football League. (Connolly, Daniel)
March 14, 2011 20 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. This case is reassigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson. Judge Patrick J. Schiltz no longer assigned to the case. NOTE: the new case number is 11-cv-639 (SRN/JJG). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (TSS)
March 14, 2011 19 Featured Case ORDER - Disqualificaton and order for reassignment. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 03/14/11. (bjs)
March 11, 2011 18 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for James M. Garland by National Football League. (Van Oort, Aaron)
March 11, 2011 17 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Gregg H. Levy by National Football League. (Van Oort, Aaron)
March 11, 2011 16 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR*** MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Benjamin C. Block by National Football League. (Van Oort, Aaron) Modified text on 3/14/2011 (lmb).
March 11, 2011 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron D Van Oort on behalf of National Football League. (Van Oort, Aaron)
March 11, 2011 14 Featured Case DISQUALIFICATION AND ORDER FOR REASSIGNMENT. Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 3/11/11. (akl)
March 11, 2011 Summons Issued as to Arizona Cardinals, Inc., Atlanta Falcons Football Club LLC, Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership, Buccaneers Limited Partnership, Buffalo Bills, Inc., Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., Cinncinnati Bengals, Inc., Cleveland Browns LLC, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., Denver Broncos Football Club, Detroit Lions, Inc., Football Northwest LLC, Green Bay Packers, Inc., Houston NFL Holdings LP, Indianapolis Colts, Inc., Jacksonville Jaguars Ltd., Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc., Miami Dolphins, Ltd., Minnesota Vikings Football Club LLC, National Football League, New England Patriots, LP, New Orleans Louisiana Saints, LLC, New York Football Giants, Inc., New York Jets Football Club, Inc., Oakland Raiders LP, Panthers Football LLC, Philadelphia Eagles Football Club, Inc., Pittsburgh Steelers Sports, Inc., Rams Football Co, LLC, The, San Diego Chargers Football Co., San Francisco Forty Niners Ltd., Tennessee Football, Inc., Washington Football Inc.. (akl)
March 11, 2011 13 DECLARATION of Donald Yee in SUPPORT OF 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Tom Brady, Drew Brees, Vincent Jackson, Ben Leber, Logan Mankins, Peyton Manning, Von Miller, Brian Robison, Osi Umenyiora, Mike Vrabel. (akl) QCd on 3/15/2011 (jam).
March 11, 2011 12 DECLARATION of Neil Schwartz in SUPPORT OF 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Tom Brady, Drew Brees, Vincent Jackson, Ben Leber, Logan Mankins, Peyton Manning, Von Miller, Brian Robison, Osi Umenyiora, Mike Vrabel. (akl) DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 3/14/11. (KT)
March 11, 2011 11 DECLARATION of William Vann McElroy in SUPPORT OF 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Tom Brady, Drew Brees, Vincent Jackson, Ben Leber, Logan Mankins, Peyton Manning, Von Miller, Brian Robison, Osi Umenyiora, Mike Vrabel. (akl) QCd on 3/15/2011 (jam).
March 11, 2011 10 DECLARATION of Neil Cornrich in SUPPORT OF 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Tom Brady, Drew Brees, Vincent Jackson, Ben Leber, Logan Mankins, Peyton Manning, Von Miller, Brian Robison, Osi Umenyiora, Mike Vrabel. (akl) QCd on 3/15/2011 (jam).
March 11, 2011 9 DECLARATION of Tom Condon in SUPPORT OF 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Tom Brady, Drew Brees, Vincent Jackson, Ben Leber, Logan Mankins, Peyton Manning, Von Miller, Brian Robison, Osi Umenyiora, Mike Vrabel. (akl) DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 3/14/11. (KT)
March 11, 2011 8 DECLARATION of Joby Branion in SUPPORT OF 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Tom Brady, Drew Brees, Vincent Jackson, Ben Leber, Logan Mankins, Peyton Manning, Von Miller, Brian Robison, Osi Umenyiora, Mike Vrabel. (akl) QCd 3/15/2011 (jam).
March 11, 2011 7 DECLARATION of Richard A. Berthelsen in SUPPORT OF 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Tom Brady, Drew Brees, Vincent Jackson, Ben Leber, Logan Mankins, Peyton Manning, Von Miller, Brian Robison, Osi Umenyiora, Mike Vrabel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(akl) Modified text on 3/14/2011 (lmb). DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 3/14/11. (KT)
March 11, 2011 6 DECLARATION of Anthony Agnone in SUPPORT OF 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Tom Brady, Drew Brees, Vincent Jackson, Ben Leber, Logan Mankins, Peyton Manning, Von Miller, Brian Robison, Osi Umenyiora, Mike Vrabel. (akl) QCd on 3/15/2011 (jam).
March 11, 2011 5 DECLARATION of Frank Bauer in SUPPORT OF 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Tom Brady, Drew Brees, Vincent Jackson, Ben Leber, Logan Mankins, Peyton Manning, Von Miller, Brian Robison, Osi Umenyiora, Mike Vrabel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-B)(akl) DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 3/14/11. (KT)
March 11, 2011 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Tom Brady, Drew Brees, Vincent Jackson, Ben Leber, Logan Mankins, Peyton Manning, Von Miller, Brian Robison, Osi Umenyiora, Mike Vrabel. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(akl) DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 3/14/11. (KT)
March 11, 2011 3 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction: Date and Time to be Determined. (akl) DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 3/14/11. (KT)
March 11, 2011 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Tom Brady, Drew Brees, Ben Leber, Logan Mankins, Peyton Manning, Von Miller, Brian Robison, Osi Umenyiora, Mike Vrabel, Vincent Jackson. (akl) DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 3/14/11. (KT)
March 11, 2011 1 COMPLAINT against Arizona Cardinals, Inc., Atlanta Falcons Football Club LLC, Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership, Buccaneers Limited Partnership, Buffalo Bills, Inc., Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., Cinncinnati Bengals, Inc., Cleveland Browns LLC, Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd., Denver Broncos Football Club, Detroit Lions, Inc., Football Northwest LLC, Green Bay Packers, Inc., Houston NFL Holdings LP, Indianapolis Colts, Inc., Jacksonville Jaguars Ltd., Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc., Miami Dolphins, Ltd., Minnesota Vikings Football Club LLC, National Football League, New England Patriots, LP, New Orleans Louisiana Saints, LLC, New York Football Giants, Inc., New York Jets Football Club, Inc., Oakland Raiders LP, Panthers Football LLC, Philadelphia Eagles Football Club, Inc., Pittsburgh Steelers Sports, Inc., Rams Football Co, LLC, The, San Diego Chargers Football Co., San Francisco Forty Niners Ltd., Tennessee Football, Inc., Washington Football Inc., filed by Tom Brady, Mike Vrabel, Von Miller, Ben Leber, Drew Brees, Peyton Manning, Brian Robison, Osi Umenyiora, Logan Mankins, Vincent Jackson. (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 44641052936) Assigned to Judge Richard H. Kyle per Antitrust List and referred to Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (akl) DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 3/14/11. (KT) Modified docket text on 3/15/2011 (TSS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Brady et al v. National Football League et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pro-Football, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chargers Football Company, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Football League
Represented By: Benjamin C Block
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Represented By: Robert M Cooper
Represented By: James M Garland
Represented By: William A Isaacson
Represented By: Gregg H Levy
Represented By: Aaron D Van Oort
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Cardinals Football Club, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin C Block
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Represented By: Robert M Cooper
Represented By: William A Isaacson
Represented By: Gregg H Levy
Represented By: Aaron D Van Oort
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlanta Falcons Football Club, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin C Block
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Represented By: Robert M Cooper
Represented By: William A Isaacson
Represented By: Gregg H Levy
Represented By: Aaron D Van Oort
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baltimore Ravens Limited Partnership
Represented By: Benjamin C Block
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Represented By: Robert M Cooper
Represented By: William A Isaacson
Represented By: Gregg H Levy
Represented By: Aaron D Van Oort
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buffalo Bills, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin C Block
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Represented By: Robert M Cooper
Represented By: William A Isaacson
Represented By: Gregg H Levy
Represented By: Aaron D Van Oort
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panthers Football, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin C Block
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Represented By: Robert M Cooper
Represented By: William A Isaacson
Represented By: Gregg H Levy
Represented By: Aaron D Van Oort
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Bears Football Club, Inc., The
Represented By: Benjamin C Block
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Represented By: Robert M Cooper
Represented By: William A Isaacson
Represented By: Gregg H Levy
Represented By: Aaron D Van Oort
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cinncinnati Bengals, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin C Block
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Represented By: Robert M Cooper
Represented By: William A Isaacson
Represented By: Gregg H Levy
Represented By: Aaron D Van Oort
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleveland Browns Football Company LLC
Represented By: Benjamin C Block
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Represented By: Robert M Cooper
Represented By: William A Isaacson
Represented By: Gregg H Levy
Represented By: Aaron D Van Oort
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Vikings Football, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin C Block
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Represented By: Robert M Cooper
Represented By: William A Isaacson
Represented By: Gregg H Levy
Represented By: Aaron D Van Oort
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New England Patriots LP
Represented By: Benjamin C Block
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Represented By: Robert M Cooper
Represented By: William A Isaacson
Represented By: Gregg H Levy
Represented By: Aaron D Van Oort
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Orleans Louisiana Saints, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin C Block
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Represented By: Robert M Cooper
Represented By: William A Isaacson
Represented By: Gregg H Levy
Represented By: Aaron D Van Oort
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Football Giants, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin C Block
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Represented By: Robert M Cooper
Represented By: William A Isaacson
Represented By: Gregg H Levy
Represented By: Aaron D Van Oort
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Jets LLC
Represented By: Benjamin C Block
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Represented By: Robert M Cooper
Represented By: William A Isaacson
Represented By: Gregg H Levy
Represented By: Aaron D Van Oort
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakland Raiders LP, The
Represented By: Benjamin C Block
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Represented By: Robert M Cooper
Represented By: William A Isaacson
Represented By: Gregg H Levy
Represented By: Aaron D Van Oort
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philadelphia Eagles, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin C Block
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Represented By: Robert M Cooper
Represented By: William A Isaacson
Represented By: Gregg H Levy
Represented By: Aaron D Van Oort
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pittsburgh Steelers Sports, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin C Block
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Represented By: Robert M Cooper
Represented By: William A Isaacson
Represented By: Gregg H Levy
Represented By: Aaron D Van Oort
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco Forty Niners Ltd.
Represented By: Benjamin C Block
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Represented By: Robert M Cooper
Represented By: William A Isaacson
Represented By: Gregg H Levy
Represented By: Aaron D Van Oort
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Football Northwest LLC
Represented By: Benjamin C Block
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Represented By: Robert M Cooper
Represented By: William A Isaacson
Represented By: Gregg H Levy
Represented By: Aaron D Van Oort
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buccaneers Limited Partnership
Represented By: Benjamin C Block
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Represented By: Robert M Cooper
Represented By: William A Isaacson
Represented By: Gregg H Levy
Represented By: Aaron D Van Oort
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tennessee Football, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin C Block
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Represented By: Robert M Cooper
Represented By: William A Isaacson
Represented By: Gregg H Levy
Represented By: Aaron D Van Oort
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PDB Sports, Ltd.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Louis Rams Partnership, The
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacksonville Jaguars, Ltd.
Represented By: Benjamin C Block
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Represented By: Robert M Cooper
Represented By: William A Isaacson
Represented By: Gregg H Levy
Represented By: Aaron D Van Oort
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas City Chiefs Football Club, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin C Block
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Represented By: Robert M Cooper
Represented By: William A Isaacson
Represented By: Gregg H Levy
Represented By: Aaron D Van Oort
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami Dolphins, Ltd.
Represented By: Benjamin C Block
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Represented By: Robert M Cooper
Represented By: William A Isaacson
Represented By: Gregg H Levy
Represented By: Aaron D Van Oort
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dallas Cowboys Football Club, Ltd.
Represented By: Benjamin C Block
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Represented By: Robert M Cooper
Represented By: William A Isaacson
Represented By: Gregg H Levy
Represented By: Aaron D Van Oort
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detroit Lions, Inc., The
Represented By: Benjamin C Block
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Represented By: Robert M Cooper
Represented By: William A Isaacson
Represented By: Gregg H Levy
Represented By: Aaron D Van Oort
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Bay Packers, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin C Block
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Represented By: Robert M Cooper
Represented By: William A Isaacson
Represented By: Gregg H Levy
Represented By: Aaron D Van Oort
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houston NFL Holdings, LP
Represented By: Benjamin C Block
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Represented By: Robert M Cooper
Represented By: William A Isaacson
Represented By: Gregg H Levy
Represented By: Aaron D Van Oort
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indianapolis Colts, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin C Block
Represented By: David Boies
Represented By: Daniel J Connolly
Represented By: Robert M Cooper
Represented By: William A Isaacson
Represented By: Gregg H Levy
Represented By: Aaron D Van Oort
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Brady
Represented By: Timothy R Thornton
Represented By: Jennifer Stewart
Represented By: DeMaurice F Smith
Represented By: James W Quinn
Represented By: Justi R Miller
Represented By: Bruce S Meyer
Represented By: Jeffrey L Kessler
Represented By: David L Greenspan
Represented By: David G Feher
Represented By: Molly Donovan
Represented By: Christopher R Clark
Represented By: Barbara P Berens
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drew Brees
Represented By: Timothy R Thornton
Represented By: Jennifer Stewart
Represented By: DeMaurice F Smith
Represented By: James W Quinn
Represented By: Justi R Miller
Represented By: Bruce S Meyer
Represented By: Jeffrey L Kessler
Represented By: David L Greenspan
Represented By: David G Feher
Represented By: Molly Donovan
Represented By: Christopher R Clark
Represented By: Barbara P Berens
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Jackson
Represented By: Timothy R Thornton
Represented By: Jennifer Stewart
Represented By: DeMaurice F Smith
Represented By: James W Quinn
Represented By: Justi R Miller
Represented By: Bruce S Meyer
Represented By: Jeffrey L Kessler
Represented By: David L Greenspan
Represented By: David G Feher
Represented By: Molly Donovan
Represented By: Christopher R Clark
Represented By: Barbara P Berens
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ben Leber
Represented By: Barbara P Berens
Represented By: Christopher R Clark
Represented By: Molly Donovan
Represented By: David G Feher
Represented By: David L Greenspan
Represented By: Jeffrey L Kessler
Represented By: Bruce S Meyer
Represented By: Justi R Miller
Represented By: James W Quinn
Represented By: DeMaurice F Smith
Represented By: Jennifer Stewart
Represented By: Timothy R Thornton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Logan Mankins
Represented By: Barbara P Berens
Represented By: Christopher R Clark
Represented By: Molly Donovan
Represented By: David G Feher
Represented By: David L Greenspan
Represented By: Jeffrey L Kessler
Represented By: Bruce S Meyer
Represented By: Justi R Miller
Represented By: James W Quinn
Represented By: DeMaurice F Smith
Represented By: Jennifer Stewart
Represented By: Timothy R Thornton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peyton Manning
Represented By: Barbara P Berens
Represented By: Christopher R Clark
Represented By: Molly Donovan
Represented By: David G Feher
Represented By: David L Greenspan
Represented By: Jeffrey L Kessler
Represented By: Bruce S Meyer
Represented By: Justi R Miller
Represented By: James W Quinn
Represented By: DeMaurice F Smith
Represented By: Jennifer Stewart
Represented By: Timothy R Thornton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Von Miller
Represented By: Barbara P Berens
Represented By: Christopher R Clark
Represented By: Molly Donovan
Represented By: David G Feher
Represented By: David L Greenspan
Represented By: Jeffrey L Kessler
Represented By: Bruce S Meyer
Represented By: Justi R Miller
Represented By: James W Quinn
Represented By: DeMaurice F Smith
Represented By: Jennifer Stewart
Represented By: Timothy R Thornton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Robison
Represented By: Barbara P Berens
Represented By: Christopher R Clark
Represented By: Molly Donovan
Represented By: David G Feher
Represented By: David L Greenspan
Represented By: Jeffrey L Kessler
Represented By: Bruce S Meyer
Represented By: Justi R Miller
Represented By: James W Quinn
Represented By: DeMaurice F Smith
Represented By: Jennifer Stewart
Represented By: Timothy R Thornton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Osi Umenyiora
Represented By: Barbara P Berens
Represented By: Christopher R Clark
Represented By: Molly Donovan
Represented By: David G Feher
Represented By: David L Greenspan
Represented By: Jeffrey L Kessler
Represented By: Bruce S Meyer
Represented By: Justi R Miller
Represented By: James W Quinn
Represented By: DeMaurice F Smith
Represented By: Jennifer Stewart
Represented By: Timothy R Thornton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Vrabel
Represented By: Barbara P Berens
Represented By: Christopher R Clark
Represented By: Molly Donovan
Represented By: David G Feher
Represented By: David L Greenspan
Represented By: Jeffrey L Kessler
Represented By: Bruce S Meyer
Represented By: Justi R Miller
Represented By: James W Quinn
Represented By: DeMaurice F Smith
Represented By: Jennifer Stewart
Represented By: Timothy R Thornton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Eller
Represented By: Arthur N Bailey, Jr
Represented By: Vincent J Esades
Represented By: Mark J Feinberg
Represented By: Michael D Hausfeld
Represented By: Samuel D Heins
Represented By: Michael E Jacobs
Represented By: Jon T King
Represented By: Michael P Lehmann
Represented By: Daniel S Mason
Represented By: Hilary K Scherrer
Represented By: Shawn D Stuckey
Represented By: David R Woodward
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Priest Holmes
Represented By: Arthur N Bailey, Jr
Represented By: Vincent J Esades
Represented By: Mark J Feinberg
Represented By: Michael D Hausfeld
Represented By: Samuel D Heins
Represented By: Michael E Jacobs
Represented By: Jon T King
Represented By: Michael P Lehmann
Represented By: Daniel S Mason
Represented By: Hilary K Scherrer
Represented By: Shawn D Stuckey
Represented By: David R Woodward
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Obafemi Ayanbadejo
Represented By: Arthur N Bailey, Jr
Represented By: Vincent J Esades
Represented By: Mark J Feinberg
Represented By: Michael D Hausfeld
Represented By: Samuel D Heins
Represented By: Michael E Jacobs
Represented By: Jon T King
Represented By: Michael P Lehmann
Represented By: Daniel S Mason
Represented By: Hilary K Scherrer
Represented By: Shawn D Stuckey
Represented By: David R Woodward
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Collins
Represented By: Arthur N Bailey, Jr
Represented By: Vincent J Esades
Represented By: Mark J Feinberg
Represented By: Michael D Hausfeld
Represented By: Samuel D Heins
Represented By: Michael E Jacobs
Represented By: Jon T King
Represented By: Michael P Lehmann
Represented By: Daniel S Mason
Represented By: Hilary K Scherrer
Represented By: Shawn D Stuckey
Represented By: David R Woodward
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antawan Walker
Represented By: Arthur N Bailey, Jr
Represented By: Vincent J Esades
Represented By: Mark J Feinberg
Represented By: Michael D Hausfeld
Represented By: Samuel D Heins
Represented By: Michael E Jacobs
Represented By: Jon T King
Represented By: Michael P Lehmann
Represented By: Daniel S Mason
Represented By: Hilary K Scherrer
Represented By: Shawn D Stuckey
Represented By: David R Woodward
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]