Dietz v. Spangenberg et al

Defendant: Acclaim Financial Group, LLC, NMPP, Inc., Walter J. Gates, III, P.A., Christian Spangenberg, Stephen Peary, FPX, LLC, FP Tech Holdings, LLC, TechDev Holdings, LLC, Erich L. Spangenberg and Audrey E. Spangenberg
Plaintiff: Michael S Dietz
Case Number: 0:2011cv02600
Filed: September 9, 2011
Court: Minnesota District Court
Office: DMN Office
County: Olmsted
Referring Judge: Jeanne J. Graham
Presiding Judge: Ann D. Montgomery
Nature of Suit: Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 8, 2013 53 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER regarding level of review. The Court will conduct a de novo review of the Summary Judgment Order in ruling on Defendants Objections 12 Attachs. 16, 17; the parties shall submit supplemental briefs (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 03/08/2013. (TLU)
August 29, 2013 64 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER the Objection of Defendant Walter J. Gates, III, P.A. [12, Attach. 16] is SUSTAINED; the Objection of the remaining Defendants [12, Attach. 17] is SUSTAINED IN PART and OVERRULED IN PART; the findings of fact and conclusi ons of law in the Bankruptcy Court's Order Denying Motions for Summary Judgment [12, Attach. 12] are MODIFIED; the Summary Judgment Motion of Defendant Walter J. Gates, III, P.A. [10, Attach. 11] is GRANTED; Defendant Walter J. Gates, III, P.A. is DISMISSED as a defendant in this case;the Summary Judgment Motion of Defendants Erich L. Spangenberg; Audrey E. Spangenberg; Christian Spangenberg; Stephen Peary; FPX, LLC; FP Tech Holdings, LLC; TechDev Holdings, LLC; Acclaim Financial Group, LLC ; and NMPP, Inc. [10, Attach. 12] is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; Christian Spangenberg is DISMISSED as a defendant in this case; the findings of fact and conclusions of law in the Bankruptcy Court's Order Granting Leave to Amend Complai nt [12, Attach. 11] are MODIFIED; the Bankruptcy Court's Order to File Document Under Seal and Determination Regarding Attorney-Client Privilege [12, Attach. 10] is VACATED as moot (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 08/29/2013. (TLU)
February 11, 2014 91 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 76 Defendants' Motion in Limine; granting 79 Defendants' Motion to Quash. The subpoenas compelling Audrey and Erich Spangenberg's attendance at trial are quashed. The Trustee shall appear at a deposition not to exceed four hours in length, to be held at a mutually agreed upon date and time no later than March 6, 2014, unless Defendants agree to a later date (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 2/11/2014. (TLU)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dietz v. Spangenberg et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acclaim Financial Group, LLC
Represented By: Lara O Glaesman
Represented By: Robert T Kugler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NMPP, Inc.
Represented By: Lara O Glaesman
Represented By: Robert T Kugler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter J. Gates, III, P.A.
Represented By: Lara O Glaesman
Represented By: Robert T Kugler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Spangenberg
Represented By: Robert T Kugler
Represented By: Lara O Glaesman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Peary
Represented By: Lara O Glaesman
Represented By: Robert T Kugler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FPX, LLC
Represented By: Lara O Glaesman
Represented By: Robert T Kugler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FP Tech Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Lara O Glaesman
Represented By: Robert T Kugler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TechDev Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Lara O Glaesman
Represented By: Robert T Kugler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erich L. Spangenberg
Represented By: Robert T Kugler
Represented By: Lara O Glaesman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audrey E. Spangenberg
Represented By: Robert T Kugler
Represented By: Lara O Glaesman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael S Dietz
Represented By: Christopher D Nelson
Represented By: Scott J Hoss
Represented By: Michael S Dietz
Represented By: John C Beatty
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]