Kalberer v. Teamsters Local 120

Plaintiff: George H. Kalberer
Defendant: Teamsters Local 120
 
Case Number: 0:2012cv01098
Filed: May 4, 2012
 
Court: Minnesota District Court
Office: DMN Office
County: Rice
Presiding Judge: Richard H. Kyle
Referring Judge: Janie S. Mayeron
 
Nature of Suit: Labor/Management Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 15, 2012 10 Featured Case ORDER that Defendant shall serve and file a memorandum in response to 6 Motion to Remand on or before May 29, 2012. No further briefing shall be permitted absent further Order of the Court. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 05/15/12. (kll) cc: George H. Kalberer Modified on 5/15/2012 (jam).
May 30, 2012 12 Featured Case ORDER denying 6 Petition for Remand. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 05/30/12. (kll)cc: George H. Kalberer Modified on 5/30/2012 (jam).
September 4, 2012 24 Featured Case ORDER setting briefing on 21 Motion for Summary Judgment and Injunctive Relief. If the Court desires a hearing on the Motion, the parties will be so notified. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 09/04/12. (kll)cc: George H. Kalberer Modified on 9/4/2012 (jam).
November 13, 2012 41 Featured Case ORDER denying as moot 21 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 28 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 11/13/12. (kll)
February 12, 2013 48 Featured Case ORDER granting 44 Application on Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal; granting 47 Application on Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 02/12/13. (kll) cc: George H. Kalberer. Modified on 2/12/2013 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Kalberer v. Teamsters Local 120
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George H. Kalberer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teamsters Local 120
Represented By: Martin J Costello
Represented By: Katrina E Joseph
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]