Mervil v. United States of America - FTCA et al

Defendant: Donald Collins, Matthew Levisay, United States of America - FTCA, Nicole English, Sandra Lauring and Mary Ellen Rivers-Graham
Plaintiff: Elainaise Mervil
 
Case Number: 0:2012cv01581
Filed: June 29, 2012
 
Court: Minnesota District Court
Office: DMN Office
County: Waseca
Referring Judge: Arthur J. Boylan
Presiding Judge: David S. Doty
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 6, 2014 86 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the defendants' Motion to Dismiss be granted [Docket No. 48] and that plaintiff Elainaise Mervil's complaint alleging FTCA claims against the United States, as well as claims against all of the individually named defendants for violation of civil rights under Bivens v. Six Unnamed Federal Agents, 403 U.S. 388 (1971), be dismissed with prejudice [Docket No. 1]. Objections to R&R due by 1/21/2014. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 1/6/14. cc: Elainaise Mervil(jam)
January 22, 2014 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Granting 48 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Donald Collins, Nicole Engisch, Sandra Lauring, United States of America - FTCA, Mary Ellen Rivers-Graham, Matthew Levisay; Adopting 86 Report and Recommendation. (Written Opinion). Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 1/24/2014. (PJM)
February 13, 2014 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER staying further proceedings in this matter pending resolution of appeal to the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals.(Written Opinion). Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 12/13/2014. (PJM) CC: Mervil. (kt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Mervil v. United States of America - FTCA et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Collins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Levisay
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America - FTCA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole English
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Lauring
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Ellen Rivers-Graham
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elainaise Mervil
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]