Carlson v. Dooly et al

Defendant: Johnson, Holt and Becky Dooly
Plaintiff: David R Carlson
 
Case Number: 0:2013cv00241
Filed: January 30, 2013
 
Court: Minnesota District Court
County: Carlton
Presiding Judge: Joan N. Ericksen
Referring Judge: Jeanne J. Graham
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 24, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 8 - Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, 2 , is DENIED. This action is summarily DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915A(b)(1). Plaintiff is required to pay the unpai d balance of the Court filing fee, namely the sum of $338.00, in accordance with 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(2). Plaintiff's motions for appointment of counsel and discovery, 4 , are DENIED. The dismissal of this action shall be counted as a "strike" against Plaintiff for purposes of 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(g).(Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on April 24, 2013. (CBC)
June 27, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on June 27, 2013. (CBC)
July 2, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff is assessed the $455 appellate filing fees. The prison officials at the institution where Plaintiff is incarcerated shall pay the $12.00 initial partial appellate filing fee from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Co urt. The prison officials at the institution where Plaintiff is incarcerated shall pay the remaining balance of his appellate filing fees, $443.00, from his account to the Clerk of Court in the manner prescribed by 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2). Plaintiff's application to proceed IFP on appeal [Docket No. 15] is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court shall send copies of this Order to Plaintiff, to the prison officials at the institution where Plaintiff is incarcerated, and to the United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on July 1, 2013. (CBC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Carlson v. Dooly et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Becky Dooly
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David R Carlson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]