B.S., A minor, by and through his mother and next friend, Michelle Soderberg et al v. Forest Laboratories, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
B. S., a minor, by and through his mother and next friend, Michelle Soderberg and Michelle Soderberg, Individually |
Defendant: |
Forest Laboratories, Inc. and Forest Pharmaceuticals, Inc. |
Case Number: |
2:2015cv04002 |
Filed: |
January 7, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of Missouri |
Office: |
Jefferson City Office |
County: |
Cole |
Presiding Judge: |
Nanette K. Laughrey |
Nature of Suit: |
Personal Injury- Product Liability |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 8, 2015 |
Filing
38
ORDER denying Plaintiff's motion to dismiss, Doc. 35 . Signed by Judge Nanette Laughrey on 7/8/2015. (Hatting, Elizabeth)
|
April 28, 2015 |
Filing
32
ORDER denying Plaintiff's motion to remand, Doc. 9 . Signed by Judge Nanette Laughrey on 4/28/2015. (Hatting, Elizabeth)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: B.S., A minor, by and through his mother and next friend, Michelle Soderberg et al v. Forest Laboratories, Inc. et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: B. S., a minor, by and through his mother and next friend, Michelle Soderberg |
Represented By: |
David C. DeGreeff |
Represented By: |
Michael S. Kruse |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Michelle Soderberg, Individually |
Represented By: |
David C. DeGreeff |
Represented By: |
Michael S. Kruse |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Forest Laboratories, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Sandra J. Wunderlich |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Forest Pharmaceuticals, Inc. |
Represented By: |
George Francis Verschelden |
Represented By: |
Sandra J. Wunderlich |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?