USA v. Herbek, et al

Defendant: Linda E. Herbek, Roger H. Herbek and Security National Bank
Plaintiff: United States of America
: Susan L. Knight
 
Case Number: 4:1992cv03040
Filed: February 10, 1992
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 24, 2010 49 Featured Case ORDER TO ANSWER INTERROGATORIES that Linda E. Herbek will answer within 20 days of the date of the service of this order each of the items contained within the sheet entitled Interrogatories Propounded by United States of America to Defendant, which accompanied the pleading entitled Motion to Compel Judgment Debtor to Answer Written Interrogatories and Memorandum in Support Thereof 47 mailed to defendant on 1/15/2010. A copy of this order shall be mailed to the defendant return receipt requested as ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (SED)
February 24, 2010 50 Featured Case ORDER TO ANSWER INTERROGATORIES that Roger H. Herbek will answer within 20 days of the date of the service of this order each of the items contained within the sheet entitled Interrogatories Propounded by United States of America to Defendant, which accompanied the pleading entitled Motion to Compel Judgment Debtor to Answer Written Interrogatories and Memorandum in Support Thereof 45 mailed to defendant on 1/15/2010. A copy of this order shall be mailed to the defendant return receipt requested as ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (SED)
April 20, 2010 55 Featured Case ORDER that upon presentation and consideration of the United States' Motion 53 , IT IS ORDERED that Defendant, Roger Herbek, appear in Courtroom No. 1, Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, Nebraska, on Thursday, May 20, 2010, a t 1:00 p.m. and show cause why he should not be held in contempt and punished for failing to comply with the court's order that he answer interrogatories. The United States Marshal is directed to make personal service of the foregoing Motion and this Order upon the Defendant. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (1 Certified copy to USM) (JSF)
April 20, 2010 56 Featured Case ORDER that upon presentation and consideration of the United States' Motion 54 , IT IS ORDERED that Defendant, Linda Herbek, appear in Courtroom No. 1, Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, Nebraska, on Thursday, May 20, 2010, a t 1:00 p.m. and show cause why she should not be held in contempt and punished for failing to comply with the court's order that she answer interrogatories. The United States Marshal is directed to make personal service of the foregoing Motion and this Order upon the Defendant. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (1 Certified copy to USM) (JSF)
May 19, 2010 58 Featured Case ORDER that the show cause hearing as to Roger H. Herbek and Linda E. Herbek set for May 20, 2010, is canceled until further order of the court. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JSF)
May 20, 2010 61 Featured Case ORDER upon 59 Suggestion of Bankruptcy and 60 Suggestion of Bankruptcy, This case is referred to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Nebraska. The Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of Nebraska shall deliver the court file to the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court for the District of Nebraska. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (ADB, )
February 16, 2011 65 Featured Case ORDER pursuant to 64 Findings and Recommendation, the referral of this matter to the Bankruptcy Court is withdrawn and the case is returned to the District Court for further proceedings, as appropriate. On or before March 1, 2011, the United State s shall advise the undersigned whether a hearing should be rescheduled on the motions to show cause why the defendants Roger Herbek and Linda Herbek should not be held in contempt (filings 53, 54) or whether this case should be closed. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (ADB, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: USA v. Herbek, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda E. Herbek
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger H. Herbek
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Security National Bank
Represented By: Carla J. Alexander
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Laurie M. Barrett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]