Thiele Dairy v. Earthsoils, et al

Plaintiff: Thiele Dairy
Defendant: Earthsoils and Mike A. McCormack
 
Case Number: 4:2008cv03015
Filed: January 25, 2008
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
County: Antelope
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Referring Judge: David L. Piester
 
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Torts to Land
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 17, 2008 73 Featured Case ORDER - 1. Defendants' motion to dismiss counterclaim (filing 68 ) is granted; 2. Defendants' counterclaim (filing 17 ) is dismissed without prejudice; 3. The motion for summary judgment (filing 53 ) filed by Plaintiff with regard to Defendants' counterclaim is denied as moot; 4. Final judgment will be withheld until all claims in this matter are resolved. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JAB)
March 2, 2009 78 Featured Case ORDER granting 77 Motion for an order requiring designation of discovery material intended to be used at trial. Each party shall, not later than May 1, 2009, serve upon all other parties its designations of discovery material it intends to offer i n its case in chief other than for solely impeachment purposes. All designations, objections, counter-designations, and objections to counter-designations shall be incorporated into the final pretrial order. Any objections not made by the date and in the manner prescribed by this order shall be deemed waived. Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Piester. (JAB)
March 19, 2009 79 Featured Case ORDER - The court has been advised that the parties in the above-captioned matter have reached a settlement of their claims. Within thirty (30) calendar days of the date of this order, the parties shall file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) with the clerk of the court. This case is removed from the court's June 8, 2009 trial docket upon representation by the parties that the case has settled. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JAB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Thiele Dairy v. Earthsoils, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thiele Dairy
Represented By: David A. Domina
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earthsoils
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike A. McCormack
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]